OH HB7 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 109.32, 109.54, 2915.01, and 2915.02 of the Revised Code to permit the Bureau of Criminal Identification and Investigation to investigate criminal activity related to the Gambling Law, to make changes related to schemes of chance, and to require certifications related to the conduct of a sweepstakes with the use of a sweepstakes terminal device.
Title
To permit the Bureau of Criminal Identification and Investigation to investigate criminal activity related to the Gambling Law, to make changes related to schemes of chance, and to require certifications related to the conduct of a sweepstakes with the use of a sweepstakes terminal device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Effective Date | |
2013-06-04 | Governor' Action | |
2013-06-10 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-05-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Concurrence | |
2013-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-05-22 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-14 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-03-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-03-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-01-30 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-01-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 15 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |