OH HB652 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1761.05, 1761.06, 1761.08, 1761.09, 1761.10, 1761.12, 1761.13, and 1761.17 of the Revised Code relative to the operation of credit union share guaranty corporations, including with respect to the primary guaranteed amount, license renewals, reinsurance and lines of credit, corrective action agreements with participating credit unions, special premium assessments, and investments.
Title
Relative to the operation of credit union share guaranty corporations, including with respect to the primary guaranteed amount, license renewals, reinsurance and lines of credit, corrective action agreements with participating credit unions, special premium assessments, and investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report | |
2014-11-20 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2014-11-20 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report | |
2014-11-05 | To Financial Institutions, Housing and Urban Development | |
2014-11-05 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 61 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 61 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |