OH HB519 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on September 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 101.70, 102.02, 102.03, 109.31, 109.572, 109.71, 109.77, 109.79, 121.41, 121.60, 1705.48, 2915.01, 2915.02, 2915.081, 2915.082, 2915.09, 2915.091, 2915.101, 3793.02, 4301.355, 4301.62, 4303.181, 4303.182, 4303.30, 5502.03, 5703.052, 5703.19, 5703.21, 5703.70, 5747.01, 5747.02, 5747.20, and 5747.98 and to enact sections 3517.1015, 3772.01 to 3772.03, 3772.031, 3772.032, 3772.033, 3772.034, 3772.04, 3772.05, 3772.051, 3772.06, 3772.061, 3772.062, 3772.07, 3772.08, 3772.09, 3772.091, 3772.10, 3772.11, 3772.111, 3772.112, 3772.12, 3772.121, 3772.13, 3772.131, 3772.14 to 3772.33, 3772.99, 3793.032, 5747.063, 5753.01 to 5753.06, 5753.061, and 5753.07 to 5753.10 of the Revised Code to create the Ohio Casino Control Commission and related provisions and to set forth casino gaming statutes under Ohio Constitution, Article XV, Section 6(C), to make changes to bingo and instant bingo laws, and to allow raffles of free prizes at professional sporting events.
Title
To create the Ohio Casino Control Commission and related provisions and to set forth casino gaming statutes under Ohio Constitution, Article XV, Section 6(C), to make changes to bingo and instant bingo laws, and to allow raffles of free prizes at professional sporting events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-10 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-10 | Governor' Action | |
2010-06-16 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-06-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2010-06-03 | Conference Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-06-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-05-28 | To Government Oversight | |
2010-05-28 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-26 | Committee Report* S | |
2010-05-18 | To *Finance & Appropriations | |
2010-05-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 01 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 02 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 02 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 21 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 014 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 22 | 045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 22 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 26 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 05 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 15 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 06 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 082 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 083 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 15 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 15 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
35 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 17 | 1015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 69 | 081 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 72 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 062 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 081 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 72 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 93 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 93 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 93 | 032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 01 | 355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 03 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
55 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 02 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 03 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 063 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 53 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 53 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |