OH HB514 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-05 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4511.01, 4511.04, 4511.213, 5501.03, and 5525.16 of the Revised Code to authorize the Director of Transportation to enter into an agreement or contract with any entity to establish a traveler information program to provide real-time traffic conditions and travel time information at no cost to the traveler, to require motor vehicle operators to take certain actions upon approaching a highway maintenance vehicle, and to modify the standard for determining the amount of the performance and payment bonds for certain Department of Transportation contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize the Director of Transportation to enter into an agreement or contract with any entity to establish a traveler information program to provide real-time traffic conditions and travel time information at no cost to the traveler, to require motor vehicle operators to take certain actions upon approaching a highway maintenance vehicle, and to modify the standard for determining the amount of the performance and payment bonds for certain Department of Transportation contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-05 Committee Report - S
2012-05-24 To Highways & Transportation
2012-05-24 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-17 Committee Report - S
2012-04-12 To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security
2012-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451101Amended CodeCitation Text
451104Amended CodeCitation Text
4511213Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5501Amended CodeCitation Text
550103Amended CodeCitation Text
5525Amended CodeCitation Text
552516Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback