OH HB511 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 23 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - To Ways & Means & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Ways and Means and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 121.22, 122.15, 122.151, 122.152, 122.153, 122.154, 122.28, 122.30 to 122.36, 150.03, 150.05, 150.07, 150.10, and 184.02 and to repeal section 122.29 of the Revised Code to make various changes to the administration of the investment tax credit and the venture capital loan loss tax credit, including the increase of the maximum amount of the investment tax credit and the venture capital loan loss tax credit and the elimination of the Industrial Technology and Enterprise Advisory Councils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make various changes to the administration of the investment tax credit and the venture capital loan loss tax credit, including the increase of the maximum amount of the investment tax credit and the venture capital loan loss tax credit and the elimination of the Industrial Technology and Enterprise Advisory Councils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 To Ways & Means & Economic Development
2012-05-24 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-22 Committee Report - S
2012-04-12 To Ways & Means
2012-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12122Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12215Amended CodeCitation Text
122151Amended CodeCitation Text
122152Amended CodeCitation Text
122153Amended CodeCitation Text
122154Amended CodeCitation Text
12228Amended CodeCitation Text
12229Repealed CodeCitation Text
12230Amended CodeCitation Text
12231Amended CodeCitation Text
12232Amended CodeCitation Text
12233Amended CodeCitation Text
12234Amended CodeCitation Text
12235Amended CodeCitation Text
150Amended CodeCitation Text
15003Amended CodeCitation Text
15005Amended CodeCitation Text
15007Amended CodeCitation Text
15010Amended CodeCitation Text
184Amended CodeCitation Text
18402Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5725Amended CodeCitation Text
572533Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback