OH HB510 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 122.17, 122.171, 122.85, 145.114, 145.116, 149.311, 150.01, 150.07, 150.10, 715.013, 742.114, 742.116, 1311.85, 1311.86, 1311.87, 1311.88, 3307.152, 3307.154, 3309.157, 3309.159, 5505.068, 5505.0610, 5703.052, 5703.053, 5703.70, 5707.03, 5709.76, 5711.22, 5713.03, 5725.02, 5725.14, 5725.16, 5725.26, 5725.33, 5733.01, 5733.02, 5733.021, 5733.06, 5747.01, 5747.98, 5751.01, 5751.011, 5751.012, and 5751.98, to enact sections 5701.12, 5726.01 to 5726.04, 5726.041, 5726.05 to 5726.08, 5726.10, 5726.20, 5726.21, 5726.30 to 5726.33, 5726.36, 5726.40 to 5726.43, 5726.50 to 5726.57, 5726.98, 5726.99, 5747.65, and 5751.54 of the Revised Code, and to repeal Section 757.51 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly to impose a new tax on financial institutions, effective January 1, 2014, to provide that such institutions and dealers in intangibles are no longer subject to the corporation franchise tax or dealers in intangibles tax after 2013, to require dealers in intangibles that are not owned by a financial institution to pay the commercial activity tax after 2013 except for "small dollar lenders," which will become subject to the new financial institutions tax, to make changes to the law regarding commercial real estate broker liens, to require county auditors to account for the impact of police powers and other governmental actions in the valuation of real property, and to accelerate the application of provisions of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly affecting the valuation of real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

, and to repeal Section 757.51 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly to impose a new tax on financial institutions, effective January 1, 2014, to provide that such institutions and dealers in intangibles are no longer subject to the corporation franchise tax or dealers in intangibles tax after 2013, to require dealers in intangibles that are not owned by a financial institution to pay the commercial activity tax after 2013 except for "small dollar lenders," which will become subject to the new financial institutions tax, to make changes to the law regarding commercial real estate broker liens, to require county auditors to account for the impact of police powers and other governmental actions in the valuation of real property, and to accelerate the application of provisions of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly affecting the valuation of real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-11 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-11 Concurrence
2012-12-05 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-05 Committee Report - S
2012-05-17 To Ways & Means & Economic Development
2012-05-17 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-16 Committee Report - S
2012-04-12 To Ways & Means
2012-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12217Amended CodeCitation Text
122171Amended CodeCitation Text
12285Amended CodeCitation Text
145Amended CodeCitation Text
145114Amended CodeCitation Text
145116Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
149311Amended CodeCitation Text
150Amended CodeCitation Text
15001Amended CodeCitation Text
15007Amended CodeCitation Text
15010Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1311Amended CodeCitation Text
131185Amended CodeCitation Text
131186Amended CodeCitation Text
131187Amended CodeCitation Text
131188Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3307Amended CodeCitation Text
3307152Amended CodeCitation Text
3307154Amended CodeCitation Text
3309Amended CodeCitation Text
3309157Amended CodeCitation Text
3309159Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5505Amended CodeCitation Text
55050610Amended CodeCitation Text
5505068Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5701New CodeSee Bill Text
570112New CodeSee Bill Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
5703052Amended CodeCitation Text
5703053Amended CodeCitation Text
570370Amended CodeCitation Text
5707Amended CodeCitation Text
570703Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570976Amended CodeCitation Text
5711Amended CodeCitation Text
571122Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
571303Amended CodeCitation Text
5725Amended CodeCitation Text
572502Amended CodeCitation Text
572514Amended CodeCitation Text
572516Amended CodeCitation Text
572526Amended CodeCitation Text
572533Amended CodeCitation Text
5726New CodeSee Bill Text
572601New CodeSee Bill Text
572602New CodeSee Bill Text
572603New CodeSee Bill Text
572604New CodeSee Bill Text
5726041New CodeSee Bill Text
572605New CodeSee Bill Text
572606New CodeSee Bill Text
572607New CodeSee Bill Text
572610New CodeSee Bill Text
572620New CodeSee Bill Text
572621New CodeSee Bill Text
572630New CodeSee Bill Text
572631New CodeSee Bill Text
572632New CodeSee Bill Text
572636New CodeSee Bill Text
572640New CodeSee Bill Text
572641New CodeSee Bill Text
572642New CodeSee Bill Text
572650New CodeSee Bill Text
572651New CodeSee Bill Text
572652New CodeSee Bill Text
572653New CodeSee Bill Text
572654New CodeSee Bill Text
572655New CodeSee Bill Text
572656New CodeSee Bill Text
572698New CodeSee Bill Text
572699New CodeSee Bill Text
5733Amended CodeCitation Text
573301Amended CodeCitation Text
573302Amended CodeCitation Text
5733021Amended CodeCitation Text
573306Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text
574765New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
5751011Amended CodeCitation Text
5751012Amended CodeCitation Text
575154New CodeSee Bill Text
575198Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
715Amended CodeCitation Text
715013Amended CodeCitation Text
742Amended CodeCitation Text
742114Amended CodeCitation Text
742116Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback