OH HB509 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 9.833, 118.023, 118.06, 118.31, 120.08, 120.53, 124.42, 305.171, 307.12, 307.86, 307.861, 307.87, 307.88, 307.932, 308.13, 329.40, 505.60, 505.601, 505.603, 511.23, 703.21, 731.141, 735.05, 737.03, 749.26, 749.28, 749.31, 753.15, 755.29, 755.30, 1545.07, 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.03, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.31, 1907.11, 2907.27, 2929.26, 3316.04, 3316.06, 3709.08, 3709.28, 3709.36, 3729.05, 4123.41, 5301.68, 5301.69, 5705.392, 5705.41, 5709.40, 5709.41, 5709.73, 5709.77, and 5713.041, 5715.13, 5715.19, 6115.20, 6119.02, and 6119.10, to enact sections 125.183, 319.09, and 505.012, and to repeal sections 507.07 and 3709.081 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing local governments, to expressly define "residential property" for the purpose of the existing limitation on tax exemption for such property under the tax increment financing law, to modify the requirements of arresting authorities and courts regarding venereal disease testing of individuals accused of certain offenses, to modify the manner in which funds are allocated from the Ohio Legal Aid Fund, to modify the deadline for the certification to the ballot of the major political parties' candidates for president and vice-president for the November 6, 2012, general election, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes to the laws governing local governments, to expressly define "residential property" for the purpose of the existing limitation on tax exemption for such property under the tax increment financing law, to modify the requirements of arresting authorities and courts regarding venereal disease testing of individuals accused of certain offenses, to modify the manner in which funds are allocated from the Ohio Legal Aid Fund, to modify the deadline for the certification to the ballot of the major political parties' candidates for president and vice-president for the November 6, 2012, general election, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-28 Effective Date
2012-06-26 Governor' Action
2012-07-02 End of 10-day period
2012-06-20 Sent to Governor
2012-06-13 Concurrence
2012-06-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-04-26 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2012-04-26 Introduced to Senate
2012-04-25 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-25 Committee Report - S
2012-04-12 To Local Government
2012-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
118Amended CodeCitation Text
118023Amended CodeCitation Text
11806Amended CodeCitation Text
11831Amended CodeCitation Text
120Amended CodeCitation Text
12008Amended CodeCitation Text
12053Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
12442Amended CodeCitation Text
125New CodeSee Bill Text
125183New CodeSee Bill Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1545Amended CodeCitation Text
154507Amended CodeCitation Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
190101Amended CodeCitation Text
190102Amended CodeCitation Text
190103Amended CodeCitation Text
190107Amended CodeCitation Text
190108Amended CodeCitation Text
190131Amended CodeCitation Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190711Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2907Amended CodeCitation Text
290727Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292926Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
305Amended CodeCitation Text
305171Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
30712Amended CodeCitation Text
30786Amended CodeCitation Text
307861Amended CodeCitation Text
30787Amended CodeCitation Text
30788Amended CodeCitation Text
307932Amended CodeCitation Text
308Amended CodeCitation Text
30813Amended CodeCitation Text
319Amended CodeCitation Text
31909New CodeSee Bill Text
31959Amended CodeCitation Text
329Amended CodeCitation Text
32901Amended CodeCitation Text
32940Amended CodeCitation Text
32941Amended CodeCitation Text
32942Amended CodeCitation Text
32943Amended CodeCitation Text
32944Amended CodeCitation Text
32945Amended CodeCitation Text
32946Amended CodeCitation Text
330Amended CodeCitation Text
33004Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3316Amended CodeCitation Text
331604Amended CodeCitation Text
331606Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3709Amended CodeCitation Text
370908Amended CodeCitation Text
3709081Repealed CodeCitation Text
370928Amended CodeCitation Text
370934Amended CodeCitation Text
370936Amended CodeCitation Text
3729Amended CodeCitation Text
372905Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412341Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
505012New CodeSee Bill Text
50560Amended CodeCitation Text
505601Amended CodeCitation Text
505603Amended CodeCitation Text
507Repealed CodeCitation Text
50707Repealed CodeCitation Text
511Amended CodeCitation Text
51123Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510101Amended CodeCitation Text
53Amended CodeCitation Text
5301Amended CodeCitation Text
530168Amended CodeCitation Text
530169Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
5705392Amended CodeCitation Text
570541Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570940Amended CodeCitation Text
570941Amended CodeCitation Text
570973Amended CodeCitation Text
570977Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
5713041Amended CodeCitation Text
5715Amended CodeCitation Text
571513Amended CodeCitation Text
571519Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6115Amended CodeCitation Text
611520Amended CodeCitation Text
6119Amended CodeCitation Text
611902Amended CodeCitation Text
611910Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
703Amended CodeCitation Text
70321Amended CodeCitation Text
723Amended CodeCitation Text
72352Amended CodeCitation Text
72353Amended CodeCitation Text
731Amended CodeCitation Text
731141Amended CodeCitation Text
735Amended CodeCitation Text
73505Amended CodeCitation Text
737Amended CodeCitation Text
73703Amended CodeCitation Text
749Amended CodeCitation Text
74926Amended CodeCitation Text
74928Amended CodeCitation Text
74931Amended CodeCitation Text
753Amended CodeCitation Text
75315Amended CodeCitation Text
755Amended CodeCitation Text
75529Amended CodeCitation Text
75530Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback