OH HB508 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 6 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 122.85, 131.02, 349.01, 1545.21, 1701.86, 1702.47, 3769.28, 4301.42, 4303.33, 4701.01, 4701.04, 5703.261, 5703.37, 5703.47, 5705.313, 5709.084, 5709.40, 5709.41, 5709.73, 5709.78, 5727.84, 5727.86, 5731.39, 5733.056, 5735.02, 5735.03, 5735.35, 5739.01, 5739.02, 5739.021, 5739.023, 5739.026, 5739.04, 5739.17, 5741.08, 5743.20, 5743.61, 5743.66, 5747.082, 5751.01, 5751.011, 5751.012, 5751.03, 5751.04, 5751.05, 5751.051, 5751.12, 5751.20, and 5751.22, to enact section 5703.061, and to repeal section 5751.032 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing the assessment, levy, and collection of taxes in the state and to the laws governing public accounting firm peer review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes to the laws governing the assessment, levy, and collection of taxes in the state and to the laws governing public accounting firm peer review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-06 Effective Date
2012-06-06 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Concurrence
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-17 Committee Report - S
2012-04-26 To Ways & Means & Economic Development
2012-04-26 Introduced to Senate
2012-04-25 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-24 Committee Report - S
2012-04-12 To Ways & Means
2012-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12285Amended CodeCitation Text
131Amended CodeCitation Text
13102Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1545Amended CodeCitation Text
154521Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1701Amended CodeCitation Text
170186Amended CodeCitation Text
1702Amended CodeCitation Text
170247Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
349Amended CodeCitation Text
34901Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3318Amended CodeCitation Text
3318011Amended CodeCitation Text
331836Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3769Amended CodeCitation Text
376928Amended CodeCitation Text
43Amended CodeCitation Text
4301Amended CodeCitation Text
430142Amended CodeCitation Text
4303Amended CodeCitation Text
430333Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4701Amended CodeCitation Text
470101Amended CodeCitation Text
470104Amended CodeCitation Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4928Amended CodeCitation Text
492823Amended CodeCitation Text
49282314Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
5703061New CodeSee Bill Text
5703261Amended CodeCitation Text
570337Amended CodeCitation Text
570347Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
5705313Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
5709084Amended CodeCitation Text
570940Amended CodeCitation Text
570941Amended CodeCitation Text
570973Amended CodeCitation Text
570978Amended CodeCitation Text
5727Amended CodeCitation Text
572784Amended CodeCitation Text
572786Amended CodeCitation Text
5731Amended CodeCitation Text
573139Amended CodeCitation Text
5733Amended CodeCitation Text
5733056Amended CodeCitation Text
573326Amended CodeCitation Text
5735Amended CodeCitation Text
573502Amended CodeCitation Text
573503Amended CodeCitation Text
573535Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573901Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text
5739021Amended CodeCitation Text
5739023Amended CodeCitation Text
5739026Amended CodeCitation Text
573904Amended CodeCitation Text
573917Amended CodeCitation Text
5741Amended CodeCitation Text
574108Amended CodeCitation Text
5743Amended CodeCitation Text
574320Amended CodeCitation Text
574361Amended CodeCitation Text
574366Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
5747082Amended CodeCitation Text
574711Amended CodeCitation Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
5751011Amended CodeCitation Text
5751012Amended CodeCitation Text
575103Amended CodeCitation Text
5751032Repealed CodeCitation Text
575104Amended CodeCitation Text
575105Amended CodeCitation Text
5751051Amended CodeCitation Text
575108Amended CodeCitation Text
575112Amended CodeCitation Text
575120Amended CodeCitation Text
575122Amended CodeCitation Text
5753Amended CodeCitation Text
575303Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback