OH HB495 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5701.11 of the Revised Code to expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since October 16, 2009, into Ohio law; to suspend the operation of sections 101.82, 101.83, 101.84, 101.85, 101.86, and 101.87 of the Revised Code and Section 6 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly to postpone operation of the sunset review law until July 1, 2011; and to declare an emergency.
Title
And Section 6 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly to postpone operation of the sunset review law until July 1, 2011; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-08 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-08 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-08 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-07 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Effective Date | |
2010-12-15 | Governor' Action | |
2010-12-25 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-12-08 | Concurrence | |
2010-12-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-12-07 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-06-08 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-06-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-27 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-04-15 | To State Government | |
2010-04-15 | Introduced to House |