OH HB492 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 122.17, 122.171, 122.86, 166.21, 718.15, 718.151, 3734.905, 4921.13, 4921.19, 5703.056, 5703.059, 5703.21, 5727.47, 5727.91, 5735.01, 5735.026, 5735.05, 5735.062, 5735.07, 5735.09, 5735.12, 5735.141, 5735.23, 5736.01, 5736.02, 5736.03, 5736.04, 5736.06, 5736.09, 5736.13, 5743.01, 5743.021, 5743.024, 5743.025, 5743.03, 5743.04, 5743.05, 5743.051, 5743.112, 5743.52, 5743.65, 5747.08, 5747.98, 5751.01, and 5751.20, to enact sections 5736.041 and 5736.50, and to repeal sections 183.35, 5726.08, 5733.30, 5735.16, 5743.06, and 5745.10 of the Revised Code to provide authorization and conditions for the levy and administration of taxes in this state.
Title
To provide authorization and conditions for the levy and administration of taxes in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-16 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-10 | To Finance | |
2014-04-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-03 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-03-18 | To Ways and Means | |
2014-03-18 | Introduced to House |