OH HB489 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 9.981, 102.03, 121.02, 121.03, 121.22, 122.01, 122.011, 122.07, 122.071, 122.17, 122.171, 122.174, 122.175, 122.39, 122.41, 122.42, 122.43, 122.44, 122.48, 122.49, 122.50, 122.51, 122.52, 122.53, 122.561, 122.57, 122.60, 122.601, 122.602, 122.603, 122.61, 122.62, 122.64, 122.76, 122.80, 122.86, 149.43, 164.05, 164.06, 164.08, 166.01, 166.04, 166.05, 166.13, 166.14, 166.18, 166.19, 166.25, 166.30, 174.01, 184.01, 187.01, 187.03, 187.04, 187.05, 929.03, 1551.01, 3735.672, 3746.35, 5117.22, 5709.68, 5709.882, 6103.052, and 6117.062, to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 122.07 (122.073) and 122.071 (122.072), to enact new sections 122.07 and 122.071 and sections 122.97, 184.011, 3735.01, and 5701.15, and to repeal sections 1525.11, 1525.12, 1525.13, and 6111.034 of the Revised Code; to repeal section 122.40 of the Revised Code on July 1, 2012; to rename the Department of Development the "Development Services Agency"; to establish the Office of TourismOhio within the Development Services Agency, create the TourismOhio Advisory Board, and establish a pilot program to test a new funding mechanism for the state's travel and tourism marketing; to modify the operation of JobsOhio; to makes changes to the Capital Access Loan Program Fund and to allow transfers to the Capital Access Loan Program Fund from the Minority Business Enterprise Loan Fund; to provide for projects that were started prior to receiving a tax credit from the Ohio Tax Credit Authority; to modify reporting requirements under the Voluntary Action Program; to require the Director of Development Services to administer federal funds received for Brownfields revitalization purposes; to terminate the Water and Sewer Commission; to terminate the Development Financing Advisory Council as of July 1, 2012; and to increase the membership of the Third Frontier Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

On July 1, 2012; to rename the Department of Development the "Development Services Agency"; to establish the Office of TourismOhio within the Development Services Agency, create the TourismOhio Advisory Board, and establish a pilot program to test a new funding mechanism for the state's travel and tourism marketing; to modify the operation of JobsOhio; to makes changes to the Capital Access Loan Program Fund and to allow transfers to the Capital Access Loan Program Fund from the Minority Business Enterprise Loan Fund; to provide for projects that were started prior to receiving a tax credit from the Ohio Tax Credit Authority; to modify reporting requirements under the Voluntary Action Program; to require the Director of Development Services to administer federal funds received for Brownfields revitalization purposes; to terminate the Water and Sewer Commission; to terminate the Development Financing Advisory Council as of July 1, 2012; and to increase the membership of the Third Frontier Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-25 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Amendment (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-26 To Finance
2012-04-26 Introduced to Senate
2012-04-25 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-24 Committee Report - S
2012-03-22 To State Government & Elections
2012-03-22 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
102Amended CodeCitation Text
10203Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12102Amended CodeCitation Text
12103Amended CodeCitation Text
12122Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12201Amended CodeCitation Text
122011Amended CodeCitation Text
12207Amended CodeCitation Text
122071Amended CodeCitation Text
12217Amended CodeCitation Text
122171Amended CodeCitation Text
122174Amended CodeCitation Text
122175Amended CodeCitation Text
12239Amended CodeCitation Text
12241Amended CodeCitation Text
12242Amended CodeCitation Text
12243Amended CodeCitation Text
12244Amended CodeCitation Text
12248Amended CodeCitation Text
12249Amended CodeCitation Text
12250Amended CodeCitation Text
12251Amended CodeCitation Text
12252Amended CodeCitation Text
12253Amended CodeCitation Text
122561Amended CodeCitation Text
12257Amended CodeCitation Text
12260Amended CodeCitation Text
122601Amended CodeCitation Text
122602Amended CodeCitation Text
122603Amended CodeCitation Text
12261Amended CodeCitation Text
12262Amended CodeCitation Text
12264Amended CodeCitation Text
12276Amended CodeCitation Text
12280Amended CodeCitation Text
12286Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
164Amended CodeCitation Text
16405Amended CodeCitation Text
16406Amended CodeCitation Text
16408Amended CodeCitation Text
166Amended CodeCitation Text
16601Amended CodeCitation Text
16604Amended CodeCitation Text
16605Amended CodeCitation Text
16613Amended CodeCitation Text
16614Amended CodeCitation Text
16618Amended CodeCitation Text
16619Amended CodeCitation Text
16625Amended CodeCitation Text
16630Amended CodeCitation Text
174Amended CodeCitation Text
17401Amended CodeCitation Text
184Amended CodeCitation Text
18401Amended CodeCitation Text
18402Amended CodeCitation Text
187Amended CodeCitation Text
18701Amended CodeCitation Text
18703Amended CodeCitation Text
18704Amended CodeCitation Text
18705Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1525Repealed CodeCitation Text
152511Repealed CodeCitation Text
152512Repealed CodeCitation Text
152513Repealed CodeCitation Text
1551Amended CodeCitation Text
155101Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3735Amended CodeCitation Text
3735672Amended CodeCitation Text
3746Amended CodeCitation Text
374635Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5117Amended CodeCitation Text
511722Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570968Amended CodeCitation Text
5709882Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6103Amended CodeCitation Text
6103052Amended CodeCitation Text
6111Repealed CodeCitation Text
6111034Repealed CodeCitation Text
6117Amended CodeCitation Text
6117062Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
929Amended CodeCitation Text
92903Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback