OH HB488 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-37)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-37)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1306.20, 2913.01, 2913.02, 2913.43, 2913.49, 2913.61, 3307.01, 3333.28, 4729.12, 4729.13, 4729.15, 4731.36, 4743.04, 5902.02, 5903.03, 5903.10, 5903.11, 5903.12, 5903.121, 5907.01, and 5907.04 and to enact sections 2305.112, 2307.611, 3333.164, 3345.42, 3345.421, 3345.422, 3345.423, 3345.424, 5903.01, 5903.04, 5903.05, and 5903.15 of the Revised Code to require state institutions of higher education to award credit for military training, to increase penalties for certain theft, deception, and identity fraud offenses when the victim is an active duty service member, to allow for a civil action for victims of identity fraud, to make other changes regarding state support and benefits for veterans and their spouses, and to clarify membership in the State Teachers Retirement System.
Title
To require state institutions of higher education to award credit for military training, to increase penalties for certain theft, deception, and identity fraud offenses when the victim is an active duty service member, to allow for a civil action for victims of identity fraud, to make other changes regarding state support and benefits for veterans and their spouses, and to clarify membership in the State Teachers Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-16 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-10 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2014-04-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-18 | To Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2014-03-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 06 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
23 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 05 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 07 | 611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 13 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 07 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 33 | 164 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 421 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 422 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 423 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 424 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 43 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
59 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 02 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 03 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 03 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 03 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 03 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 07 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 07 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |