OH HB486 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-3)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-3)
Status: Passed on September 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
122.37, 122.64, 122.89, 122.94, 122.941, 127.14, 149.311, 150.10, 166.13, 166.18, 184.02, 1551.34, 3731.02, 4740.06, and 6301.12 and to enact sections 107.35, 3333.91, and 6301.11 of the Revised Code to revise the coordination of workforce development and economic development programs; to synchronize the due dates of several reports due from the Development Services Agency, the Ohio Venture Capital Authority, and the Third Frontier Commission; to revise the law regarding innovation financial assistance and research and development financial assistance; to require the Department of Job and Family Services to consult with the Governor's executive workforce board and create a list of in-demand jobs in this state; to require the Office of Workforce Development annual report to be completed annually by July 30; to make changes regarding the administration of the Medicaid Reserve Fund; and to permit the Director of Commerce, the State Fire Marshal, and the Ohio Construction Industry Licensing Board to establish compliance incentive programs.
Title
To revise the coordination of workforce development and economic development programs; to synchronize the due dates of several reports due from the Development Services Agency, the Ohio Venture Capital Authority, and the Third Frontier Commission; to revise the law regarding innovation financial assistance and research and development financial assistance; to require the Department of Job and Family Services to consult with the Governor's executive workforce board and create a list of in-demand jobs in this state; to require the Office of Workforce Development annual report to be completed annually by July 30; to make changes regarding the administration of the Medicaid Reserve Fund; and to permit the Director of Commerce, the State Fire Marshal, and the Ohio Construction Industry Licensing Board to establish compliance incentive programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-16 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-10 | To Finance | |
2014-04-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-18 | To Economic Development and Regulatory Reform | |
2014-03-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 07 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 21 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 22 | 136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 89 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 94 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | 941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 27 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 43 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 43 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 50 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 66 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 66 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 84 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 84 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 51 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 29 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 13 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 33 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 31 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 40 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
63 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 01 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 01 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |