OH HB481 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 9.833, 148.06, 149.431, 2744.081, 4717.05, 4717.06, 4717.10, 4717.11, 4717.12, 4717.13, 4717.21, 4717.24, and 4717.30 of the Revised Code to authorize the Board of Embalmers and Funeral Directors to issue courtesy licenses to allow funeral directors in bordering states to conduct limited funeral-related activities in Ohio; to permit embalmers and funeral directors to place their licenses on inactive status; to clarify that, upon the sale of the funeral home, the home may remain operating based upon a submission of a new license application to the Board; to permit out-of-state funeral directors without a license to work with licensed funeral directors during a declared disaster or emergency; to eliminate the requirement that funeral homes be the guarantor of the identity of decedents and instead require funeral homes to complete only visual identification of remains; to exempt certain records concerning individual and joint self insurance of political subdivisions from the public records law; and to authorize joint county department of job and family services employees and detention facility district employees to participate in a deferred compensation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize the Board of Embalmers and Funeral Directors to issue courtesy licenses to allow funeral directors in bordering states to conduct limited funeral-related activities in Ohio; to permit embalmers and funeral directors to place their licenses on inactive status; to clarify that, upon the sale of the funeral home, the home may remain operating based upon a submission of a new license application to the Board; to permit out-of-state funeral directors without a license to work with licensed funeral directors during a declared disaster or emergency; to eliminate the requirement that funeral homes be the guarantor of the identity of decedents and instead require funeral homes to complete only visual identification of remains; to exempt certain records concerning individual and joint self insurance of political subdivisions from the public records law; and to authorize joint county department of job and family services employees and detention facility district employees to participate in a deferred compensation program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-12 Concurrence
2012-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-06 Committee Report - S
2012-05-22 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2012-05-22 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-09 Committee Report - S
2012-03-13 To State Government & Elections
2012-03-13 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
148Amended CodeCitation Text
14806Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
149431Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1713Amended CodeCitation Text
171336Amended CodeCitation Text
1721Amended CodeCitation Text
172106Amended CodeCitation Text
172118Amended CodeCitation Text
172121Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2108Amended CodeCitation Text
210815Amended CodeCitation Text
210870Amended CodeCitation Text
210872Amended CodeCitation Text
210875Amended CodeCitation Text
210882Amended CodeCitation Text
210883Amended CodeCitation Text
210884Amended CodeCitation Text
210885Amended CodeCitation Text
210886Amended CodeCitation Text
210887Amended CodeCitation Text
2111Amended CodeCitation Text
211113Amended CodeCitation Text
27Amended CodeCitation Text
2743Amended CodeCitation Text
274351Amended CodeCitation Text
2744Amended CodeCitation Text
2744081Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
313Amended CodeCitation Text
31312Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3705Amended CodeCitation Text
370501Amended CodeCitation Text
370517Amended CodeCitation Text
370518Amended CodeCitation Text
370519Amended CodeCitation Text
370520Amended CodeCitation Text
3707Amended CodeCitation Text
370719Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
4511451Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4717Amended CodeCitation Text
471701Amended CodeCitation Text
471704Amended CodeCitation Text
471705Amended CodeCitation Text
471706Amended CodeCitation Text
471707Amended CodeCitation Text
471708Amended CodeCitation Text
471710Amended CodeCitation Text
471711Amended CodeCitation Text
471712Amended CodeCitation Text
471713Amended CodeCitation Text
471714Amended CodeCitation Text
471720Amended CodeCitation Text
471721Amended CodeCitation Text
471722Amended CodeCitation Text
471723Amended CodeCitation Text
471724Amended CodeCitation Text
471725Amended CodeCitation Text
471726Amended CodeCitation Text
471727Amended CodeCitation Text
471728Amended CodeCitation Text
471730Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5120Amended CodeCitation Text
512045Amended CodeCitation Text
5121Amended CodeCitation Text
512111Amended CodeCitation Text
512153Amended CodeCitation Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5901Amended CodeCitation Text
590124Amended CodeCitation Text
590125Amended CodeCitation Text
590126Amended CodeCitation Text
590127Amended CodeCitation Text
590129Amended CodeCitation Text
590132Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
759Amended CodeCitation Text
75901Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback