OH HB479 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 317.08, 317.32, 317.321, 1336.04, 1701.73, 1702.38, 1703.22, 2101.24, 2131.08, 2131.09, 2329.66, 2329.661, 5805.06, 5808.08, 5808.18, 5815.24, 5815.25, and 5815.36 and to enact sections 1301.401, 1319.07, 1319.08, 1319.09, 5815.37, and 5816.01 to 5816.14 of the Revised Code to adopt the Ohio Legacy Trust Act; to modify certain property rights in the Ohio Trust Code; to require the recording of personal property transfers with the county recorder upon request; to regulate the temporary conveyance of trust real property for financing purposes; to grant probate courts concurrent jurisdiction with court of common pleas general divisions over certain actions involving the designation or removal of certain beneficiaries, title change involving joint and survivorship interests, alleged gifts, or the passing of assets upon death other than by will, intestate succession, or trust; to regulate the use and enforceability of certain loan covenants in nonrecourse commercial loan transactions; and to make certain changes in the exempt interests law, the fraudulent transfers law, the secured transactions recording law, and the rule against perpetuities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adopt the Ohio Legacy Trust Act; to modify certain property rights in the Ohio Trust Code; to require the recording of personal property transfers with the county recorder upon request; to regulate the temporary conveyance of trust real property for financing purposes; to grant probate courts concurrent jurisdiction with court of common pleas general divisions over certain actions involving the designation or removal of certain beneficiaries, title change involving joint and survivorship interests, alleged gifts, or the passing of assets upon death other than by will, intestate succession, or trust; to regulate the use and enforceability of certain loan covenants in nonrecourse commercial loan transactions; and to make certain changes in the exempt interests law, the fraudulent transfers law, the secured transactions recording law, and the rule against perpetuities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Amendment (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-12 Concurrence
2012-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-05 Committee Report - S
2012-06-19 To Judiciary
2012-06-19 Introduced to Senate
2012-06-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-03-13 To Judiciary & Ethics
2012-03-13 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1301New CodeSee Bill Text
1301401New CodeSee Bill Text
1319New CodeSee Bill Text
131907New CodeSee Bill Text
131908New CodeSee Bill Text
131909New CodeSee Bill Text
1336Amended CodeCitation Text
133604Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1701Amended CodeCitation Text
170173Amended CodeCitation Text
1702Amended CodeCitation Text
170238Amended CodeCitation Text
1703Amended CodeCitation Text
170322Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2101Amended CodeCitation Text
210124Amended CodeCitation Text
2131Amended CodeCitation Text
213108Amended CodeCitation Text
213109Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2329Amended CodeCitation Text
232966Amended CodeCitation Text
2329661Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
317Amended CodeCitation Text
31708Amended CodeCitation Text
31732Amended CodeCitation Text
317321Amended CodeCitation Text
58Amended CodeCitation Text
5805Amended CodeCitation Text
580506Amended CodeCitation Text
5808Amended CodeCitation Text
580808Amended CodeCitation Text
580818Amended CodeCitation Text
5815Amended CodeCitation Text
581524Amended CodeCitation Text
581525Amended CodeCitation Text
581536Amended CodeCitation Text
581537New CodeSee Bill Text
5816New CodeSee Bill Text
581601New CodeSee Bill Text
581602New CodeSee Bill Text
581603New CodeSee Bill Text
581604New CodeSee Bill Text
581605New CodeSee Bill Text
581606New CodeSee Bill Text
581607New CodeSee Bill Text
581608New CodeSee Bill Text
581609New CodeSee Bill Text
581610New CodeSee Bill Text
581611New CodeSee Bill Text
581612New CodeSee Bill Text
581613New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback