OH HB473 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 4 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1501.32, 1501.33, 1521.04, 1522.03, and 1522.05, to enact sections 1522.10, 1522.101, 1522.11 to 1522.13, 1522.131, and 1522.14 to 1522.21, and to repeal section 1522.07 of the Revised Code to establish a program for the issuance of permits for the withdrawal and consumptive use of waters from the Lake Erie basin and to establish other requirements related to the implementation of the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish a program for the issuance of permits for the withdrawal and consumptive use of waters from the Lake Erie basin and to establish other requirements related to the implementation of the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04 Effective Date
2012-06-04 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-22 Concurrence
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-22 Committee Report
2012-04-25 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2012-04-25 Introduced to Senate
2012-04-25 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-24 Committee Report - A
2012-03-07 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2012-03-07 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1501Amended CodeCitation Text
150132Amended CodeCitation Text
150133Amended CodeCitation Text
1521Amended CodeCitation Text
152104Amended CodeCitation Text
1522Amended CodeCitation Text
152203Amended CodeCitation Text
152205Amended CodeCitation Text
152207Repealed CodeCitation Text
152210New CodeSee Bill Text
1522101New CodeSee Bill Text
152211New CodeSee Bill Text
152212New CodeSee Bill Text
1522131New CodeSee Bill Text
152214New CodeSee Bill Text
152215New CodeSee Bill Text
152216New CodeSee Bill Text
152217New CodeSee Bill Text
152218New CodeSee Bill Text
152219New CodeSee Bill Text
152220New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback