OH HB449 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 123.024, 141.02, 2108.72, 2108.73, 3313.616, 3721.50, 4503.46, 5111.21, 5533.785, 5902.02, 5907.01, 5907.02, 5907.021, 5907.04, 5907.08, 5907.10, 5907.11, 5907.12, 5907.13, 5911.10, 5913.01, 5913.011, 5913.02, 5913.021, 5919.06, 5919.26, 5919.28, 5919.29, 5919.34, 5923.05, and 5924.136, and to repeal sections 5907.023, 5907.05, and 5913.04 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 409.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to make changes to the law regarding the Ohio Veterans' Home Agency and the Department of Veterans Services, to allow a DD Form 93, Record of Emergency Data, to satisfy the written declaration requirements for designating a person authorized to direct disposition of human remains, to modify the membership of the Veterans Advisory Committee, to provide publicly employed firefighters and emergency medical technicians with a minimum paid military leave of seventeen 24-hour days, to make changes to the salaries of, and other laws regarding, the Adjutant General and assistant adjutants, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

And to amend Section 409.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to make changes to the law regarding the Ohio Veterans' Home Agency and the Department of Veterans Services, to allow a DD Form 93, Record of Emergency Data, to satisfy the written declaration requirements for designating a person authorized to direct disposition of human remains, to modify the membership of the Veterans Advisory Committee, to provide publicly employed firefighters and emergency medical technicians with a minimum paid military leave of seventeen 24-hour days, to make changes to the salaries of, and other laws regarding, the Adjutant General and assistant adjutants, and to make an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-03 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 Effective Date
2010-06-18 Governor' Action
2010-06-21 End of 10-day period
2010-06-09 Sent to Governor
2010-06-03 Concurrence
2010-06-03 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-06-02 Committee Report - S
2010-03-11 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2010-03-11 Introduced to Senate
2010-03-10 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2010-03-03 Committee Report - S
2010-02-11 To Veterans Affairs
2010-02-11 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
123Amended CodeCitation Text
123024Amended CodeCitation Text
141Amended CodeCitation Text
14102Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2108Amended CodeCitation Text
210872Amended CodeCitation Text
210873Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313616Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3721Amended CodeCitation Text
372150Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
450346Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5111Amended CodeCitation Text
511121Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5533Amended CodeCitation Text
5533785Amended CodeCitation Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5902Amended CodeCitation Text
590202Amended CodeCitation Text
5907Amended CodeCitation Text
590701Amended CodeCitation Text
590702Amended CodeCitation Text
5907021Amended CodeCitation Text
5907023Repealed CodeCitation Text
590704Amended CodeCitation Text
590705Repealed CodeCitation Text
590708Amended CodeCitation Text
590710Amended CodeCitation Text
590711Amended CodeCitation Text
590712Amended CodeCitation Text
590713Amended CodeCitation Text
5911Amended CodeCitation Text
591110Amended CodeCitation Text
5913Amended CodeCitation Text
591301Amended CodeCitation Text
5913011Amended CodeCitation Text
591302Amended CodeCitation Text
5913021Amended CodeCitation Text
591304Repealed CodeCitation Text
5919Amended CodeCitation Text
591906Amended CodeCitation Text
591926Amended CodeCitation Text
591928Amended CodeCitation Text
591929Amended CodeCitation Text
591934Amended CodeCitation Text
5923Amended CodeCitation Text
592305Amended CodeCitation Text
5924Amended CodeCitation Text
5924136Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback