OH HB440 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-39)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-39)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5533.636 and to enact sections 5533.053, 5533.255, 5533.311, 5533.464, 5533.511, 5533.641, 5533.679, 5533.781, 5533.782, 5533.783, 5533.812, 5534.03, 5534.04, 5534.07, 5534.08, 5534.09, 5534.10, 5534.11, 5534.12, 5534.13, 5534.14, 5534.40, 5534.41, and 5534.42 of the Revised Code to designate a number of memorial highways and bridges in honor of members of the armed forces of the United States and first responders.
Title
To designate a number of memorial highways and bridges in honor of members of the armed forces of the United States and first responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-22 | To Transportation | |
2014-05-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-26 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-11 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2014-02-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 33 | 053 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 255 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 464 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 636 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 33 | 641 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 679 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 781 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 782 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 783 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 812 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |