OH HB414 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on November 14 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Committee Report
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2903.211 and 2917.21 of the Revised Code to expand the offenses of menacing by stalking and telecommunications harassment and to prohibit a person from knowingly causing another person to believe that the offender will cause physical harm or mental or emotional distress to a member of the other person's immediate family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To expand the offenses of menacing by stalking and telecommunications harassment and to prohibit a person from knowingly causing another person to believe that the offender will cause physical harm or mental or emotional distress to a member of the other person's immediate family.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-14 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-12 Committee Report
2012-11-21 To Judiciary
2012-11-21 Introduced to Senate
2012-11-14 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-01-11 To Criminal Justice
2012-01-11 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
2903211Amended CodeCitation Text
2917Amended CodeCitation Text
291721Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback