OH HB396 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-11 - Committee Report - S
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 101.35, 103.0511, 107.52, 107.53, 107.54, 107.55, 107.62, 107.63, 111.15, 117.20, 119.01, 119.03, 119.04, 121.39, 121.73, 121.74, 121.81, 121.82, 121.83, 127.18, 1531.08, 3319.22, 3319.221, 3333.021, 3333.048, 3737.88, 3746.04, 4117.02, 4141.14, 5103.0325, 5117.02, 5703.14, 6111.31, and 6111.51; to enact sections 106.01, 106.02, 106.021, 106.022, 106.023, 106.03, 106.031, 106.04, 106.041, 106.042, 106.05, and 106.051; and to repeal sections 119.031 and 119.032 of the Revised Code to revise rule-making and rule review procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise rule-making and rule review procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-11 Committee Report - S
2012-04-19 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2012-04-19 Introduced to Senate
2012-04-18 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-03-28 Committee Report - S
2011-12-13 To State Government & Elections
2011-12-13 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
101Amended CodeCitation Text
10135Amended CodeCitation Text
103Amended CodeCitation Text
1030511Amended CodeCitation Text
106New CodeSee Bill Text
10601New CodeSee Bill Text
10602New CodeSee Bill Text
106021New CodeSee Bill Text
106022New CodeSee Bill Text
106023New CodeSee Bill Text
10603New CodeSee Bill Text
106031New CodeSee Bill Text
106032New CodeSee Bill Text
10604New CodeSee Bill Text
106041New CodeSee Bill Text
106042New CodeSee Bill Text
10605New CodeSee Bill Text
106051New CodeSee Bill Text
107Amended CodeCitation Text
10752Amended CodeCitation Text
10753Amended CodeCitation Text
10754Amended CodeCitation Text
10755Amended CodeCitation Text
10762Amended CodeCitation Text
10763Amended CodeCitation Text
111Amended CodeCitation Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
117Amended CodeCitation Text
11720Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11901Amended CodeCitation Text
11903Amended CodeCitation Text
119031Repealed CodeCitation Text
119032Repealed CodeCitation Text
11904Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12139Amended CodeCitation Text
12173Amended CodeCitation Text
12174Amended CodeCitation Text
12181Amended CodeCitation Text
12182Amended CodeCitation Text
12183Amended CodeCitation Text
127Amended CodeCitation Text
12718Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1531Amended CodeCitation Text
153108Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
331922Amended CodeCitation Text
3319221Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
3333021Amended CodeCitation Text
3333048Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3737Amended CodeCitation Text
373788Amended CodeCitation Text
3746Amended CodeCitation Text
374604Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4117Amended CodeCitation Text
411702Amended CodeCitation Text
4141Amended CodeCitation Text
414114Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5103Amended CodeCitation Text
51030325Amended CodeCitation Text
5117Amended CodeCitation Text
511702Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
570314Amended CodeCitation Text
61Amended CodeCitation Text
6111Amended CodeCitation Text
611131Amended CodeCitation Text
611151Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback