OH HB386 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 122.014, 173.121, 718.03, 2915.01, 2915.02, 2915.06, 2915.08, 2915.09, 2915.091, 2915.092, 2915.093, 2915.094, 2915.10, 2915.101, 2915.12, 2923.31, 2933.51, 3301.0714, 3769.08, 3769.087, 3769.089, 3769.0810, 3770.02, 3770.05, 3770.07, 3770.071, 3770.072, 3770.073, 3770.21, 3772.01, 3772.03, 3772.032, 3772.04, 3772.07, 3772.091, 3772.10, 3772.13, 3772.16, 3772.17, 3772.28, 3772.99, 4301.03, 4303.17, 5703.21, 5747.062, 5747.063, 5747.08, 5747.12, 5747.98, and 5753.03, to enact sections 121.421, 3769.041, 3769.0812, 3770.22, 3772.35, 5747.064, and 5753.11, to repeal section 3772.14 of the Revised Code, to amend Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 277 of the 129th General Assembly, and to repeal Section 4 of Sub. H.B. 277 of the 129th General Assembly to make changes to the law regarding video lottery terminals, casino gaming, bingo and instant bingo, and horse racing, to establish a moratorium on new establishments conducting sweepstakes by sweepstakes terminal devices, to make appropriations, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

, to amend Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 277 of the 129th General Assembly, and to repeal Section 4 of Sub. H.B. 277 of the 129th General Assembly to make changes to the law regarding video lottery terminals, casino gaming, bingo and instant bingo, and horse racing, to establish a moratorium on new establishments conducting sweepstakes by sweepstakes terminal devices, to make appropriations, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - Conference Committee Report (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Conference Committee Report - Emergency Clause (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Conference Committee Report - Emergency Clause (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-11 Effective Date
2012-06-11 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Concurrence
2012-05-10 Conference Committee
2012-05-09 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-09 Committee Report - S
2012-02-21 To Government Oversight & Reform
2012-02-21 Introduced to Senate
2012-02-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-02-15 Committee Report - S
2011-12-01 To Rules & Reference
2011-12-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
111Amended CodeCitation Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
121New CodeSee Bill Text
121421New CodeSee Bill Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122014Amended CodeCitation Text
173Amended CodeCitation Text
173121Amended CodeCitation Text
25Amended CodeCitation Text
2505Amended CodeCitation Text
250509Amended CodeCitation Text
250512Amended CodeCitation Text
2505122New CodeSee Bill Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2915Amended CodeCitation Text
291501Amended CodeCitation Text
291502Amended CodeCitation Text
291506Amended CodeCitation Text
291508Amended CodeCitation Text
291509Amended CodeCitation Text
2915091Amended CodeCitation Text
2915092Amended CodeCitation Text
2915093Amended CodeCitation Text
2915094Amended CodeCitation Text
291510Amended CodeCitation Text
2915101Amended CodeCitation Text
291512Amended CodeCitation Text
291518New CodeSee Bill Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292331Amended CodeCitation Text
2933Amended CodeCitation Text
293351Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301Amended CodeCitation Text
33010714Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3769Amended CodeCitation Text
3769041New CodeSee Bill Text
376908Amended CodeCitation Text
37690810Amended CodeCitation Text
37690812New CodeSee Bill Text
3769087Amended CodeCitation Text
3769089Amended CodeCitation Text
3769201Amended CodeCitation Text
376921Amended CodeCitation Text
3770Amended CodeCitation Text
377002Amended CodeCitation Text
377003Amended CodeCitation Text
377005Amended CodeCitation Text
377007Amended CodeCitation Text
3770071Amended CodeCitation Text
3770072Amended CodeCitation Text
3770073Amended CodeCitation Text
377021Amended CodeCitation Text
377022New CodeSee Bill Text
3772Amended CodeCitation Text
377201Amended CodeCitation Text
377203Amended CodeCitation Text
3772032Amended CodeCitation Text
377204Amended CodeCitation Text
377207Amended CodeCitation Text
3772091Amended CodeCitation Text
377210Amended CodeCitation Text
377213Amended CodeCitation Text
377214Repealed CodeCitation Text
377216Amended CodeCitation Text
377217Amended CodeCitation Text
377228Amended CodeCitation Text
377235New CodeSee Bill Text
377299Amended CodeCitation Text
43Amended CodeCitation Text
4301Amended CodeCitation Text
430103Amended CodeCitation Text
4303Amended CodeCitation Text
430317Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5503Amended CodeCitation Text
550302Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
5747062Amended CodeCitation Text
5747063Amended CodeCitation Text
5747064New CodeSee Bill Text
574708Amended CodeCitation Text
574712Amended CodeCitation Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text
5753Amended CodeCitation Text
575301Amended CodeCitation Text
575303Amended CodeCitation Text
575311New CodeSee Bill Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
718Amended CodeCitation Text
71803Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback