OH HB378 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-17)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4729.291, 4729.541, and 4729.99 and to enact section 4731.056 of the Revised Code to establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction.
Title
To establish requirements regarding controlled substances containing buprenorphine used for the purpose of treating drug dependence or addiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-12-03 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-12-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-05 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-12-05 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 056 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 19 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |