OH HB371 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 189.01, 189.03, 189.04, 189.05, 189.06, 189.07, and 189.08 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 261.10 and 261.20.93 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly regarding the Local Government Innovation Program and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

And to amend Sections 261.10 and 261.20.93 of Am. Sub. H.B. 153 of the 129th General Assembly regarding the Local Government Innovation Program and to make an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-14 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-22 Effective Date
2011-12-21 Governor' Action
2011-12-28 End of 10-day period
2011-12-16 Sent to Governor
2011-12-14 Concurrence
2011-12-14 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-12-14 Committee Report
2011-12-08 To Finance
2011-12-08 Introduced to Senate
2011-12-07 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-12-07 Committee Report - S
2011-11-03 To Finance & Appropriations
2011-11-03 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
189Amended CodeCitation Text
18901Amended CodeCitation Text
18903Amended CodeCitation Text
18904Amended CodeCitation Text
18905Amended CodeCitation Text
18906Amended CodeCitation Text
18907Amended CodeCitation Text
18908Amended CodeCitation Text
18910Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback