OH HB367 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-27 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 109.57, 1337.11, 2133.01, 2317.54, 3701.881, 3712.01, 3712.03, 3712.09, 3712.99, 3721.01, 3793.11, 3795.01, 3963.01, 4719.01, 4752.02, and 5119.22 and to enact sections 3712.031, 3712.041, 3712.051, 3712.061, and 4729.43 of the Revised Code to enact "Sarah's Law" regarding licensure of pediatric respite care programs; to establish standards for delivery of certain cancer drugs; to modify the requirements for licensure of methadone treatment programs; to amend the version of section 109.57 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on January 1, 2014, to continue amendments made by this act to that section; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

That is scheduled to take effect on January 1, 2014, to continue amendments made by this act to that section; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-29 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 2 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-11-29 - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-11-27 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-21 Committee Report - S
2012-03-28 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-03-28 Introduced to Senate
2012-03-27 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-03-14 Committee Report
2011-11-01 To Health & Aging
2011-11-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10957Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1337Amended CodeCitation Text
133711Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2133Amended CodeCitation Text
213301Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2317Amended CodeCitation Text
231754Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3701Amended CodeCitation Text
3701881Amended CodeCitation Text
3712Amended CodeCitation Text
371201Amended CodeCitation Text
371203Amended CodeCitation Text
3712031New CodeSee Bill Text
3712041New CodeSee Bill Text
3712051New CodeSee Bill Text
3712061New CodeSee Bill Text
371209Amended CodeCitation Text
371299Amended CodeCitation Text
3721Amended CodeCitation Text
372101Amended CodeCitation Text
3793Amended CodeCitation Text
379311Amended CodeCitation Text
3795Amended CodeCitation Text
379501Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3963Amended CodeCitation Text
396301Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4719Amended CodeCitation Text
471901Amended CodeCitation Text
4729New CodeSee Bill Text
472943New CodeSee Bill Text
4752Amended CodeCitation Text
475202Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5119Amended CodeCitation Text
511922Amended CodeCitation Text
511970Amended CodeCitation Text
511971Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback