OH HB366 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-25)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-25)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3712.03, 3712.04, and 3712.99 and to enact section 3712.062 of the Revised Code to require hospice care programs to establish policies to prevent diversion of controlled substances that contain opioids.
Title
To require hospice care programs to establish policies to prevent diversion of controlled substances that contain opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-27 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-02 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-12-02 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 12 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | 062 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 12 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |