OH HB364 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-21)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-21)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4928.143 and 4928.20 and to enact sections 4928.23, 4928.231, 4928.232, 4928.233, 4928.234, 4928.235, 4928.236, 4928.237, 4928.238, 4928.239, 4928.2310, 4928.2311, 4928.2312, 4928.2313, 4928.2314, 4928.2315, 4928.2316, 4928.2317, and 4928.2318 of the Revised Code to establish standards for the securitization of costs for electric distribution utilities.
Title
To establish standards for the securitization of costs for electric distribution utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2011-12-21 | Governor' Action | |
2011-12-28 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-12-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-12-14 | Concurrence | |
2011-12-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-12-14 | Committee Report | |
2011-12-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-12-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-12-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-11-01 | To Public Utilities | |
2011-11-01 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 28 | 143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 28 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 231 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2312 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2313 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2314 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2316 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2317 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 2318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 234 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 236 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 237 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 238 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | 239 | New Code | See Bill Text |