OH HB362 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.162, 3314.03, 3319.111, 3319.112, 3326.02, 3326.03, 3326.04, and 3326.09 and to enact sections 3319.114 and 3326.032 of the Revised Code to authorize the STEM Committee to grant a designation of STEM school equivalent to a community school or chartered nonpublic school, to make other revisions to the law regarding STEM schools, and to make changes to the law regarding educator performance evaluations.
Title
To authorize the STEM Committee to grant a designation of STEM school equivalent to a community school or chartered nonpublic school, to make other revisions to the law regarding STEM schools, and to make changes to the law regarding educator performance evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-12 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-06-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-07 | To Education | |
2014-04-07 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-27 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-11-26 | To Education | |
2013-11-26 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |