OH HB360 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 125.183, 167.03, 2307.64, 2913.01, 3745.13, 4742.01, 4905.30, 4927.03, 4927.15, 4931.40, 4931.41, 4931.42, 4931.43, 4931.44, 4931.45, 4931.46, 4931.47, 4931.48, 4931.49, 4931.50, 4931.51, 4931.52, 4931.53, 4931.54, 4931.60, 4931.61, 4931.62, 4931.63, 4931.64, 4931.65, 4931.651, 4931.66, 4931.67, 4931.68, 4931.69, 4931.99, 5705.19, and 5733.55; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 125.183 (5507.02), 4931.40 (5507.01), 4931.41 (5507.03), 4931.42 (5507.06), 4931.43 (5507.07), 4931.44 (5507.08), 4931.45 (5507.12), 4931.46 (5507.15), 4931.47 (5507.18), 4931.48 (5507.09), 4931.49 (5507.32), 4931.50 (5507.34), 4931.51 (5507.22), 4931.52 (5507.25), 4931.53 (5507.26), 4931.54 (5507.27), 4931.60 (5507.40), 4931.61 (5507.42), 4931.62 (5507.46), 4931.63 (5507.53), 4931.64 (5507.55), 4931.65 (5507.57), 4931.651 (5507.571), 4931.66 (5507.60), 4931.67 (5507.63), 4931.68 (5507.65), 4931.69 (5507.66), 4931.75 (4931.10), and 4931.99 (5507.99); to enact new section 4931.99 and sections 5507.021, 5507.022, 5507.44, 5507.51, and 5507.52; and to repeal section 4931.70 of the Revised Code to transfer certain 9-1-1 authority to the Director of Public Safety and to the tax commissioner, to revise the amount and methods of collection and remittance of the wireless 9-1-1 charge for prepaid wireless services, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To transfer certain 9-1-1 authority to the Director of Public Safety and to the tax commissioner, to revise the amount and methods of collection and remittance of the wireless 9-1-1 charge for prepaid wireless services, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-11 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-20 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-11 Concurrence
2012-12-05 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-05 Committee Report - S
2012-05-16 To Energy & Public Utilities
2012-05-16 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-03-28 Committee Report - S
2011-11-01 To Public Utilities
2011-11-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
125Amended CodeCitation Text
125183Amended CodeCitation Text
167Amended CodeCitation Text
16703Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2307Amended CodeCitation Text
230764Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2913Amended CodeCitation Text
291301Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3745Amended CodeCitation Text
374513Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4742Amended CodeCitation Text
474201Amended CodeCitation Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4905Amended CodeCitation Text
490530Amended CodeCitation Text
4927Amended CodeCitation Text
492703Amended CodeCitation Text
492715Amended CodeCitation Text
4931Amended CodeCitation Text
493140Amended CodeCitation Text
493141Amended CodeCitation Text
493142Amended CodeCitation Text
493143Amended CodeCitation Text
493144Amended CodeCitation Text
493145Amended CodeCitation Text
493146Amended CodeCitation Text
493147Amended CodeCitation Text
493148Amended CodeCitation Text
493149Amended CodeCitation Text
493150Amended CodeCitation Text
493151Amended CodeCitation Text
493152Amended CodeCitation Text
493153Amended CodeCitation Text
493154Amended CodeCitation Text
493160Amended CodeCitation Text
493161Amended CodeCitation Text
4931611New CodeSee Bill Text
493162Amended CodeCitation Text
4931621New CodeSee Bill Text
4931622New CodeSee Bill Text
493163Amended CodeCitation Text
493164Amended CodeCitation Text
493165Amended CodeCitation Text
4931651Amended CodeCitation Text
493166Amended CodeCitation Text
493167Amended CodeCitation Text
493168Amended CodeCitation Text
493169Amended CodeCitation Text
493170Repealed CodeCitation Text
493175Amended CodeCitation Text
493199Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
570519Amended CodeCitation Text
5733Amended CodeCitation Text
573355Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback