OH HB349 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3781.111, 4510.31, 4511.01, 4511.041, 4511.09, 4511.102, 4511.103, 4511.105, 4511.106, 4511.11, 4511.13, 4511.131, 4511.14, 4511.37, 4511.69, and 4955.33 and to repeal section 4511.15 of the Revised Code to make changes in certain provisions relating to road signs and traffic signals for purposes of the Ohio Manual of Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Title
To make changes in certain provisions relating to road signs and traffic signals for purposes of the Ohio Manual of Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Effective Date | |
2012-01-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-01-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-01-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-01-10 | Concurrence | |
2012-01-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-01-10 | Committee Report | |
2011-12-14 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2011-12-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-12-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-12-01 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-10-20 | To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2011-10-20 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 81 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 55 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |