OH HB341 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 6 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3903.81, 3907.14, 3921.10, 3921.13, 3921.19, 3921.22, 3921.28, 3921.29, 3921.30, 3921.31, 3921.33, 3922.01, 3922.02, 3922.03, 3922.04, 3922.05, 3922.06, 3922.09, 3922.10, 3922.11, 3922.14, 3922.15, 3922.16, 3922.19, and 3925.08, to enact new section 3921.35 and sections 3921.101 and 3921.191, and to repeal section 3921.35 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law regulating fraternal benefit societies, the laws regulating insurance company investments, and the law regulating adverse benefit determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes to the law regulating fraternal benefit societies, the laws regulating insurance company investments, and the law regulating adverse benefit determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-06 Effective Date
2012-06-06 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-23 Concurrence
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-05-16 Committee Report - S
2012-02-21 To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
2012-02-21 Introduced to Senate
2012-02-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-02-02 Committee Report - S
2011-10-06 To Insurance
2011-10-06 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3903Amended CodeCitation Text
390381Amended CodeCitation Text
3907Amended CodeCitation Text
390714Amended CodeCitation Text
3921Amended CodeCitation Text
392110Amended CodeCitation Text
392113Amended CodeCitation Text
392119Amended CodeCitation Text
392122Amended CodeCitation Text
392128Amended CodeCitation Text
392129Amended CodeCitation Text
392130Amended CodeCitation Text
392131Amended CodeCitation Text
392133Amended CodeCitation Text
392135Repealed CodeCitation Text
3922Amended CodeCitation Text
392201Amended CodeCitation Text
392202Amended CodeCitation Text
392203Amended CodeCitation Text
392204Amended CodeCitation Text
392205Amended CodeCitation Text
392206Amended CodeCitation Text
392209Amended CodeCitation Text
392210Amended CodeCitation Text
392211Amended CodeCitation Text
392214Amended CodeCitation Text
392215Amended CodeCitation Text
392216Amended CodeCitation Text
392219Amended CodeCitation Text
3925Amended CodeCitation Text
392508Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback