OH HB34 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend Section 201 of Sub. H.B. 123 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation for the biennium beginning July 1, 2013, and ending June 30, 2015, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's programs.
Title
To amend Section 201 of Sub. H.B. 123 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation for the biennium beginning July 1, 2013, and ending June 30, 2015, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Effective Date | |
2013-03-26 | Governor' Action | |
2013-04-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-03-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-03-13 | Concurrence | |
2013-03-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-03-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-05 | To Commerce & Labor | |
2013-03-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-02-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-02-27 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-05 | To Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-02-05 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 21 | 129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 21 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 21 | 441 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 23 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 353 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |