OH HB337 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-01-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2935.36, 2951.041, 4506.01, 4506.05, 4506.07, 4506.09, 4506.10, 4506.101, 4506.12, 4506.13, 4506.14, 4506.15, 4506.16, 4506.161, 4506.17, 4506.21, 4510.03, 4510.036, 4513.37, 5101.35, 5101.351, 5107.12, 5107.14, and 5577.05 and to enact section 4506.131 of the Revised Code to make changes in the law governing commercial drivers' licenses, including hazardous material endorsements, medical certification requirements, disqualifications, conviction records, and establishing texting while driving as a serious traffic violation, to exclude certain components from the prohibited length dimensions of specified types of vehicles, to revise the law governing self-sufficiency contracts established under the Ohio Works First program, to eliminate requirements that the Department of Job and Family Services employ, contract with, or designate only attorneys to make decisions in appeals regarding family services programs, to temporarily extend the look-back period from two years to three years for determining whether a state "on" indicator exists based on the total unemployment rate for purposes of state extended unemployment benefits, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To make changes in the law governing commercial drivers' licenses, including hazardous material endorsements, medical certification requirements, disqualifications, conviction records, and establishing texting while driving as a serious traffic violation, to exclude certain components from the prohibited length dimensions of specified types of vehicles, to revise the law governing self-sufficiency contracts established under the Ohio Works First program, to eliminate requirements that the Department of Job and Family Services employ, contract with, or designate only attorneys to make decisions in appeals regarding family services programs, to temporarily extend the look-back period from two years to three years for determining whether a state "on" indicator exists based on the total unemployment rate for purposes of state extended unemployment benefits, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-24 - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-27 Effective Date
2012-01-27 Governor' Action
2012-02-08 End of 10-day period
2012-01-27 Sent to Governor
2012-01-24 Concurrence
2012-01-10 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-01-10 Committee Report - S
2011-12-08 To Highways & Transportation
2011-12-08 Introduced to Senate
2011-12-07 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-12-01 Committee Report - S
2011-09-27 To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security
2011-09-27 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2935Amended CodeCitation Text
293536Amended CodeCitation Text
2951Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4506Amended CodeCitation Text
450601Amended CodeCitation Text
450605Amended CodeCitation Text
450607Amended CodeCitation Text
450609Amended CodeCitation Text
450610Amended CodeCitation Text
4506101Amended CodeCitation Text
450612Amended CodeCitation Text
450613Amended CodeCitation Text
4506131New CodeSee Bill Text
450614Amended CodeCitation Text
450615Amended CodeCitation Text
450616Amended CodeCitation Text
4506161Amended CodeCitation Text
450617Amended CodeCitation Text
450621Amended CodeCitation Text
4510Amended CodeCitation Text
451003Amended CodeCitation Text
4510036Amended CodeCitation Text
4513Amended CodeCitation Text
451337Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510135Amended CodeCitation Text
5101351Amended CodeCitation Text
5107Amended CodeCitation Text
510712Amended CodeCitation Text
510714Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5577Amended CodeCitation Text
557705Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback