OH HB320 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-11)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-11)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.234, 3701.071, 3702.76, 3702.87, 4715.42, 4723.271, and 4731.295 and to enact sections 5.252, 3701.072, and 4723.26 of the Revised Code to require the Department of Health to maintain information on its web site regarding free clinics, to designate December as "Free Clinic Appreciation Month," to require that all free clinics be included in the state's loan repayment programs for physicians and dentists, to create a volunteer's certificate for retired nurses, and to extend for a specified period qualified immunity from civil liability for certain volunteer health care services provided in free clinics to individuals eligible for or receiving Medicaid.
Title
To require the Department of Health to maintain information on its web site regarding free clinics, to designate December as "Free Clinic Appreciation Month," to require that all free clinics be included in the state's loan repayment programs for physicians and dentists, to create a volunteer's certificate for retired nurses, and to extend for a specified period qualified immunity from civil liability for certain volunteer health care services provided in free clinics to individuals eligible for or receiving Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-13 | To Finance | |
2014-02-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-29 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-10-29 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 2341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 072 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 02 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 15 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 23 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 78 | New Code | See Bill Text |