OH HB319 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 4929.16, 4929.161, 4929.162, 4929.163, 4929.164, 4929.165, 4929.166, and 4929.167 of the Revised Code to permit natural gas companies to apply for an infrastructure development rider to recover costs of certain economic development projects.
Title
To permit natural gas companies to apply for an infrastructure development rider to recover costs of certain economic development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-11 | Committee Report | |
2014-12-09 | To Public Utilities | |
2014-12-09 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-12-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-29 | To Public Utilities | |
2013-10-29 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 09 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 29 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 161 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 162 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 164 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 165 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 166 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 167 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 29 | 168 | New Code | See Bill Text |