OH HB314 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 307.627, 307.629, 4715.30, 4723.28, 4723.481, 4725.19, 4730.25, 4730.41, 4731.22, and 5119.391 and to enact sections 3719.061 and 5119.392 of the Revised Code regarding informed consent requirements for opioid prescriptions issued to minors, disclosure of medical and other information to child fatality review boards and fetal and infant mortality review teams, and the location of methadone treatment facilities.
Title
Regarding informed consent requirements for opioid prescriptions issued to minors, disclosure of medical and other information to child fatality review boards and fetal and infant mortality review teams, and the location of methadone treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-16 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-01-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-01-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-24 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-10-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 07 | 627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 07 | 629 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 19 | 061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 15 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 23 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 283 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 481 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 25 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 30 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 30 | 252 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 30 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 19 | 391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 19 | 392 | New Code | See Bill Text |