OH HB292 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 6 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4731.07, 4731.19, 4731.22, 4731.222, 4731.224, 4731.24, and 4731.25 and to enact sections 4731.297, 4778.01, 4778.02, 4778.03, 4778.04, 4778.05, 4778.06, 4778.07, 4778.08, 4778.09, 4778.10, 4778.11, 4778.12, 4778.14, 4778.15, 4778.16, 4778.18, 4778.19, 4778.20, 4778.21, 4778.22, 4778.24, and 4778.99 of the Revised Code to establish licensure requirements for genetic counselors, to modify certain laws governing the State Medical Board, and to create a visiting clinical professional development certificate for certain physicians who are not licensed in Ohio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish licensure requirements for genetic counselors, to modify certain laws governing the State Medical Board, and to create a visiting clinical professional development certificate for certain physicians who are not licensed in Ohio.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-24 - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-06 Effective Date
2012-06-06 Governor' Action
2012-06-11 End of 10-day period
2012-05-30 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Concurrence
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-04-26 Committee Report - S
2012-02-09 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-02-09 Introduced to Senate
2012-02-08 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-12-07 Committee Report - S
2011-07-06 To Health & Aging
2011-07-06 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
4731051Amended CodeCitation Text
473107Amended CodeCitation Text
473119Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
4731222Amended CodeCitation Text
4731224Amended CodeCitation Text
473124Amended CodeCitation Text
473125Amended CodeCitation Text
4731297New CodeSee Bill Text
4778New CodeSee Bill Text
477801New CodeSee Bill Text
477802New CodeSee Bill Text
477803New CodeSee Bill Text
477804New CodeSee Bill Text
477805New CodeSee Bill Text
477806New CodeSee Bill Text
477807New CodeSee Bill Text
477808New CodeSee Bill Text
477809New CodeSee Bill Text
477810New CodeSee Bill Text
477811New CodeSee Bill Text
477812New CodeSee Bill Text
477814New CodeSee Bill Text
477815New CodeSee Bill Text
477816New CodeSee Bill Text
477818New CodeSee Bill Text
477819New CodeSee Bill Text
477820New CodeSee Bill Text
477821New CodeSee Bill Text
477822New CodeSee Bill Text
477824New CodeSee Bill Text
477899New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback