OH HB292 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 13 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-09-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 119.01, 1125.19, 1125.28, 1157.01, 1165.01, 5307.11, 5307.12, 5307.13, 5307.14, and 5307.16; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 1157.01 (1157.09) and 1165.01 (1165.09); to enact new sections 1157.01, 1157.03 to 1157.06, 1157.10 to 1157.14, 1157.17 to 1157.29, 1165.01, 1165.03 to 1165.06, 1165.10 to 1165.14, and 1165.17 to 1165.29 and sections 1157.30, 1157.33, 1165.30, 1165.33, and 5301.057; and to repeal sections 1157.02 to 1157.29 and 1165.02 to 1165.29 of the Revised Code relative to liquidations and conservatorships of banks, savings and loan associations, and savings banks, to prohibit transfer fee covenants in certain real estate transactions, and to enable a court of common pleas to order a licensed auctioneer to conduct a sale of real property pursuant to a writ of partition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to liquidations and conservatorships of banks, savings and loan associations, and savings banks, to prohibit transfer fee covenants in certain real estate transactions, and to enable a court of common pleas to order a licensed auctioneer to conduct a sale of real property pursuant to a writ of partition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-27 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-13 Effective Date
2010-06-13 Governor' Action
2010-06-21 End of 10-day period
2010-06-09 Sent to Governor
2010-06-02 Concurrence
2010-05-27 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-05-27 Committee Report - S
2010-02-04 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2010-02-04 Introduced to Senate
2010-02-03 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-12-10 Committee Report - S
2009-09-30 To Civil & Commercial Law
2009-09-30 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11901Amended CodeCitation Text
11Amended CodeCitation Text
1125Amended CodeCitation Text
112519Amended CodeCitation Text
112528Amended CodeCitation Text
1157Amended CodeCitation Text
115701Amended CodeCitation Text
115702Repealed CodeCitation Text
115703Repealed CodeCitation Text
115704Repealed CodeCitation Text
115705Repealed CodeCitation Text
115706Repealed CodeCitation Text
115707Repealed CodeCitation Text
115708Repealed CodeCitation Text
115709Repealed CodeCitation Text
115710Repealed CodeCitation Text
115711Repealed CodeCitation Text
115712Repealed CodeCitation Text
115713Repealed CodeCitation Text
115714Repealed CodeCitation Text
115715Repealed CodeCitation Text
115716Repealed CodeCitation Text
115717Repealed CodeCitation Text
115718Repealed CodeCitation Text
115719Repealed CodeCitation Text
115720Repealed CodeCitation Text
115721Repealed CodeCitation Text
115722Repealed CodeCitation Text
115723Repealed CodeCitation Text
115724Repealed CodeCitation Text
115725Repealed CodeCitation Text
115726Repealed CodeCitation Text
115727Repealed CodeCitation Text
115728Repealed CodeCitation Text
1165Amended CodeCitation Text
116501Amended CodeCitation Text
116502Repealed CodeCitation Text
116503Repealed CodeCitation Text
116504Repealed CodeCitation Text
116505Repealed CodeCitation Text
116506Repealed CodeCitation Text
116507Repealed CodeCitation Text
116508Repealed CodeCitation Text
116509Repealed CodeCitation Text
116510Repealed CodeCitation Text
116511Repealed CodeCitation Text
116512Repealed CodeCitation Text
116513Repealed CodeCitation Text
116514Repealed CodeCitation Text
116515Repealed CodeCitation Text
116516Repealed CodeCitation Text
116517Repealed CodeCitation Text
116518Repealed CodeCitation Text
116519Repealed CodeCitation Text
116520Repealed CodeCitation Text
116521Repealed CodeCitation Text
116522Repealed CodeCitation Text
116523Repealed CodeCitation Text
116524Repealed CodeCitation Text
116525Repealed CodeCitation Text
116526Repealed CodeCitation Text
116527Repealed CodeCitation Text
116528Repealed CodeCitation Text
53Amended CodeCitation Text
5301New CodeSee Bill Text
5301057New CodeSee Bill Text
5307Amended CodeCitation Text
530711Amended CodeCitation Text
530712Amended CodeCitation Text
530713Amended CodeCitation Text
530714Amended CodeCitation Text
530716Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback