OH HB279 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-12-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.33, 3107.062, 3107.063, 3109.53, 3109.59, 3109.60, 3109.66, 3109.70, 3109.71, 3109.72, 3310.41, 5153.16, and 5153.161, to enact new section 3109.76 and sections 2151.411 and 3310.43, and to repeal sections 3109.76 and 3109.77 of the Revised Code to require a public children services agency or private child placing agency that obtains temporary custody of a child to attempt to notify certain relatives of the child; to require a public children services agency to attempt to keep siblings together; to modify the putative father registry; to eliminate the automatic termination upon the expiration of one year of a power of attorney or caretaker authorization affidavit that gives care of a child to a grandparent; to allow a grandparent to seek custody of a child if the child's parent, guardian, or custodian seeks to terminate a power of attorney or caretaker authorization affidavit; to require a public children services agency to file a missing child report if a child in its custody is or may be missing; to authorize a public children services agency to provide care for a child in the home of a qualified nonrelative of the child; to require the Department of Job and Family Services to develop recommendations for the implementation of a subsidized relative guardianship program; to authorize the State Board of Education to issue one-year, renewable instructional assistant permits for qualified individuals to provide services to children under the Autism Scholarship Program; to make other changes in the administration of the Autism Scholarship Program; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require a public children services agency or private child placing agency that obtains temporary custody of a child to attempt to notify certain relatives of the child; to require a public children services agency to attempt to keep siblings together; to modify the putative father registry; to eliminate the automatic termination upon the expiration of one year of a power of attorney or caretaker authorization affidavit that gives care of a child to a grandparent; to allow a grandparent to seek custody of a child if the child's parent, guardian, or custodian seeks to terminate a power of attorney or caretaker authorization affidavit; to require a public children services agency to file a missing child report if a child in its custody is or may be missing; to authorize a public children services agency to provide care for a child in the home of a qualified nonrelative of the child; to require the Department of Job and Family Services to develop recommendations for the implementation of a subsidized relative guardianship program; to authorize the State Board of Education to issue one-year, renewable instructional assistant permits for qualified individuals to provide services to children under the Autism Scholarship Program; to make other changes in the administration of the Autism Scholarship Program; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-14 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-14 - House - Amendment (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-20 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-12 Committee Report - S
2012-11-21 To Judiciary
2012-11-21 Introduced to Senate
2012-11-14 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-09 Committee Report - S
2011-06-22 To Judiciary & Ethics
2011-06-22 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
215133Amended CodeCitation Text
2151411New CodeSee Bill Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3107Amended CodeCitation Text
3107062Amended CodeCitation Text
3107063Amended CodeCitation Text
3109Amended CodeCitation Text
310952Amended CodeCitation Text
310953Amended CodeCitation Text
310954Amended CodeCitation Text
310959Amended CodeCitation Text
310960Amended CodeCitation Text
310964New CodeSee Bill Text
310965Amended CodeCitation Text
310966Amended CodeCitation Text
310967Amended CodeCitation Text
310969Amended CodeCitation Text
310970Amended CodeCitation Text
310971Amended CodeCitation Text
310972Amended CodeCitation Text
310974Amended CodeCitation Text
310976Amended CodeCitation Text
310977Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3310Amended CodeCitation Text
331041Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
331364Amended CodeCitation Text
3313649Amended CodeCitation Text
3313672Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
5101802Amended CodeCitation Text
5153Amended CodeCitation Text
515316Amended CodeCitation Text
5153161Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback