OH HB276 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-11-25 - Introduced to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 2317.43 and to enact sections 2317.44 and 2317.45 of the Revised Code to provide that certain statements and communications made regarding an unanticipated outcome of medical care, the development or implementation of standards under certain federal laws, and an insurer's reimbursement policies and determination regarding health care services are inadmissible as evidence in a medical claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide that certain statements and communications made regarding an unanticipated outcome of medical care, the development or implementation of standards under certain federal laws, and an insurer's reimbursement policies and determination regarding health care services are inadmissible as evidence in a medical claim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-11-20 - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-11-25 Introduced to Senate
2014-11-20 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-05-29 Committee Report - S
2013-09-30 To Judiciary
2013-09-30 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2305New CodeSee Bill Text
230527New CodeSee Bill Text
2317Amended CodeCitation Text
231743Amended CodeCitation Text
231744New CodeSee Bill Text
231745New CodeSee Bill Text
2323New CodeSee Bill Text
232340New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback