OH HB268 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3.08, 163.10, 311.17, 509.15, 733.73, 733.74, 1901.25, 1907.28, 2101.30, 2311.42, 2313.01, 2313.02, 2313.03, 2313.05, 2313.11, 2313.12, 2313.13, 2313.16, 2313.18, 2313.19, 2313.20, 2313.251, 2313.29, 2313.34, 2313.38, 2313.41, 2313.42, 2313.46, 2313.47, 2313.99, 2335.28, 2938.05, 2938.14, 2939.02, 2939.03, 2945.24, 2947.23, 3314.03, 3326.11, 5155.12, and 5563.05, to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 2313.05 (2313.04), 2313.11 (2313.18), 2313.13 (2313.15), 2313.16 (2313.14), 2313.18 (2313.19), 2313.19 (2313.07), 2313.20 (2313.08), 2313.251 (2313.10), 2313.29 (2313.20), 2313.34 (2313.22), 2313.38 (2313.11), 2313.41 (2313.16), 2313.42 (2313.17), 2313.46 (2313.24), and 2313.47 (2313.13), to enact new sections 2313.05, 2313.06, 2313.09, 2313.21, and 2313.23, and to repeal sections 2313.04, 2313.06, 2313.07, 2313.08, 2313.09, 2313.10, 2313.14, 2313.15, 2313.21, 2313.22, 2313.23, 2313.24, 2313.25, 2313.26, 2313.30, 2313.32, 2313.33, 2313.35, 2313.36, 2313.37, 2313.39, 2313.40, 2313.43, and 2313.45 of the Revised Code to modernize the language of, to reorganize, and to remove obsolete provisions from the jury service law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modernize the language of, to reorganize, and to remove obsolete provisions from the jury service law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-08 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Effective Date
2012-02-21 Governor' Action
2012-02-08 Concurrence
2012-02-01 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-01-26 Committee Report - S
2011-12-08 To Judiciary
2011-12-08 Introduced to Senate
2011-12-07 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-12-07 Committee Report - S
2011-06-15 To Judiciary & Ethics
2011-06-15 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
163Amended CodeCitation Text
16310Amended CodeCitation Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
190125Amended CodeCitation Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190728Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2101Amended CodeCitation Text
210130Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2311Amended CodeCitation Text
231142Amended CodeCitation Text
2313Amended CodeCitation Text
231301Amended CodeCitation Text
231302Amended CodeCitation Text
231303Amended CodeCitation Text
231304Repealed CodeCitation Text
231305Amended CodeCitation Text
231306Repealed CodeCitation Text
231307Repealed CodeCitation Text
231308Repealed CodeCitation Text
231309Repealed CodeCitation Text
231310Repealed CodeCitation Text
231311Amended CodeCitation Text
231312Amended CodeCitation Text
231313Amended CodeCitation Text
231314Repealed CodeCitation Text
231315Repealed CodeCitation Text
231316Amended CodeCitation Text
231318Amended CodeCitation Text
231319Amended CodeCitation Text
231320Amended CodeCitation Text
231321Repealed CodeCitation Text
231322Repealed CodeCitation Text
231323Repealed CodeCitation Text
231324Repealed CodeCitation Text
231325Repealed CodeCitation Text
2313251Amended CodeCitation Text
231326Repealed CodeCitation Text
231329Amended CodeCitation Text
231330Repealed CodeCitation Text
231332Repealed CodeCitation Text
231333Repealed CodeCitation Text
231334Amended CodeCitation Text
231335Repealed CodeCitation Text
231336Repealed CodeCitation Text
231337Repealed CodeCitation Text
231338Amended CodeCitation Text
231339Repealed CodeCitation Text
231340Repealed CodeCitation Text
231341Amended CodeCitation Text
231342Amended CodeCitation Text
231343Repealed CodeCitation Text
231345Repealed CodeCitation Text
231346Amended CodeCitation Text
231347Amended CodeCitation Text
231399Amended CodeCitation Text
2335Amended CodeCitation Text
233528Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2938Amended CodeCitation Text
293805Amended CodeCitation Text
293814Amended CodeCitation Text
2939Amended CodeCitation Text
293902Amended CodeCitation Text
293903Amended CodeCitation Text
2945Amended CodeCitation Text
294524Amended CodeCitation Text
2947Amended CodeCitation Text
294723Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
311Amended CodeCitation Text
31117Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
509Amended CodeCitation Text
50915Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5155Amended CodeCitation Text
515512Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5563Amended CodeCitation Text
556305Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
733Amended CodeCitation Text
73373Amended CodeCitation Text
73374Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback