OH HB258 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4725.40 and 4725.51 and to enact section 4725.411 of the Revised Code regarding licensed spectacle dispensing opticians.
Title
Regarding licensed spectacle dispensing opticians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-07 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-11-07 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-11-06 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-09-04 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-09-04 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 25 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 25 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 25 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |