OH HB251 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4731.02, 4731.06, 4731.07, 4731.22, 4731.36, 4734.31, 4762.01, 4762.02, 4762.03, 4762.031, 4762.04, 4762.05, 4762.06, 4762.08, 4762.09, 4762.10, 4762.11, 4762.12, 4762.13, 4762.131, 4762.132, 4762.14, 4762.15, 4762.16, 4762.17, 4762.18, 4762.19, and 4762.22 and to repeal section 4731.04 of the Revised Code to regulate the practice of Oriental medicine, to modify the laws governing the practice of acupuncture, and to revise certain laws governing the State Medical Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate the practice of Oriental medicine, to modify the laws governing the practice of acupuncture, and to revise certain laws governing the State Medical Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-12 Concurrence
2012-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-06 Committee Report - S
2012-05-24 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-05-24 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-09 Committee Report - S
2011-06-01 To Health & Aging
2011-06-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473102Amended CodeCitation Text
473104Repealed CodeCitation Text
473106Amended CodeCitation Text
473107Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
473136Amended CodeCitation Text
4734Amended CodeCitation Text
473431Amended CodeCitation Text
4762Amended CodeCitation Text
476201Amended CodeCitation Text
476202Amended CodeCitation Text
476203Amended CodeCitation Text
4762031Amended CodeCitation Text
476204Amended CodeCitation Text
476205Amended CodeCitation Text
476206Amended CodeCitation Text
476208Amended CodeCitation Text
476209Amended CodeCitation Text
476210Amended CodeCitation Text
476211Amended CodeCitation Text
476212Amended CodeCitation Text
476213Amended CodeCitation Text
4762131Amended CodeCitation Text
4762132Amended CodeCitation Text
476214Amended CodeCitation Text
476215Amended CodeCitation Text
476216Amended CodeCitation Text
476217Amended CodeCitation Text
476218Amended CodeCitation Text
476219Amended CodeCitation Text
476222Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback