OH HB24 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on December 13 2011 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-14 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2950.01, 2950.11, 2950.12, and 2950.13 of the Revised Code to provide notice to a long-term care facility when a Tier III or similar category sex offender/child-victim offender indicates an intent to reside in the facility or registers an address within the specified geographical notification area including the facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide notice to a long-term care facility when a Tier III or similar category sex offender/child-victim offender indicates an intent to reside in the facility or registers an address within the specified geographical notification area including the facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-13 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-14 To Judiciary
2011-12-14 Introduced to Senate
2011-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-06-22 Committee Report
2011-01-18 To Criminal Justice
2011-01-18 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2950Amended CodeCitation Text
295001Amended CodeCitation Text
295011Amended CodeCitation Text
295012Amended CodeCitation Text
295013Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback