OH HB238 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 8 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-09-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 124.81, 141.04, 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.021, 1901.03, 1901.06, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.31, 1901.312, 1901.32, 1901.34, 1905.01, 1907.11, 1907.18, 1907.26, 2903.213, 2919.26, 3105.171, 3105.63, and 3105.65 of the Revised Code to require the court in divorce or legal separation proceedings to require the spouses to fully disclose their assets and to include nondisclosure of assets as financial misconduct, to permit a court to modify a division of property in a divorce decree or decree of dissolution of marriage upon the express written consent or agreement of both spouses, to eliminate the prohibition against a municipal or county court judge being eligible for life insurance coverage from a county or other political subdivision, to change the statutory designation of the Chardon, Lyndhurst, and Miamisburg Municipal Court judges from part-time to full-time judges, to prohibit a county court judge from retaining a fee for performing a marriage ceremony, to remove the statutorily required notice regarding possessing or purchasing a firearm when subject to certain nondomestic violence protection orders issued as a pretrial condition of release, to modify the notice requirements regarding possessing or purchasing a firearm when subject to a domestic violence-related temporary protection order, to create the Putnam County Municipal Court in Ottawa on January 1, 2011, to establish one full-time judgeship in that court, to provide for the nomination of the judge by petition only, to abolish the Putnam County County Court on that date, to designate the Putnam County Clerk of Courts as the clerk of the Putnam County Municipal Court, to provide for the election for the Putnam County Municipal Court of one full-time judge in 2011, to make deputy sheriffs ex officio bailiffs of municipal courts, to create the Montgomery County Municipal Court on July 1, 2010; to abolish the Montgomery County County Court on that date; to designate the Montgomery County Clerk of Courts as the Clerk of the Montgomery County Municipal Court; to provide for the election for the Montgomery County Municipal Court of one full-time judge and one part-time judge in 2011 and one full-time and one part-time judge in 2013; and to abolish one of the four judgeships by December 31, 2015, and one of the remaining three judgeships by December 31, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the court in divorce or legal separation proceedings to require the spouses to fully disclose their assets and to include nondisclosure of assets as financial misconduct, to permit a court to modify a division of property in a divorce decree or decree of dissolution of marriage upon the express written consent or agreement of both spouses, to eliminate the prohibition against a municipal or county court judge being eligible for life insurance coverage from a county or other political subdivision, to change the statutory designation of the Chardon, Lyndhurst, and Miamisburg Municipal Court judges from part-time to full-time judges, to prohibit a county court judge from retaining a fee for performing a marriage ceremony, to remove the statutorily required notice regarding possessing or purchasing a firearm when subject to certain nondomestic violence protection orders issued as a pretrial condition of release, to modify the notice requirements regarding possessing or purchasing a firearm when subject to a domestic violence-related temporary protection order, to create the Putnam County Municipal Court in Ottawa on January 1, 2011, to establish one full-time judgeship in that court, to provide for the nomination of the judge by petition only, to abolish the Putnam County County Court on that date, to designate the Putnam County Clerk of Courts as the clerk of the Putnam County Municipal Court, to provide for the election for the Putnam County Municipal Court of one full-time judge in 2011, to make deputy sheriffs ex officio bailiffs of municipal courts, to create the Montgomery County Municipal Court on July 1, 2010; to abolish the Montgomery County County Court on that date; to designate the Montgomery County Clerk of Courts as the Clerk of the Montgomery County Municipal Court; to provide for the election for the Montgomery County Municipal Court of one full-time judge and one part-time judge in 2011 and one full-time and one part-time judge in 2013; and to abolish one of the four judgeships by December 31, 2015, and one of the remaining three judgeships by December 31, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-25 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-08 Effective Date
2010-06-08 Governor' Action
2010-06-12 End of 10-day period
2010-06-01 Sent to Governor
2010-05-27 Concurrence
2010-05-25 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-03-11 Committee Report - S
2009-11-19 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2009-11-19 Introduced to Senate
2009-11-18 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-10-28 Committee Report
2009-06-23 To Judiciary
2009-06-23 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
12481Amended CodeCitation Text
141Amended CodeCitation Text
14104Amended CodeCitation Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
190101Amended CodeCitation Text
190102Amended CodeCitation Text
1901021Amended CodeCitation Text
190103Amended CodeCitation Text
190106Amended CodeCitation Text
190107Amended CodeCitation Text
190108Amended CodeCitation Text
190131Amended CodeCitation Text
1901312Amended CodeCitation Text
190132Amended CodeCitation Text
190134Amended CodeCitation Text
1905Amended CodeCitation Text
190501Amended CodeCitation Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190711Amended CodeCitation Text
190718Amended CodeCitation Text
190726Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
2903213Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291926Amended CodeCitation Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3105Amended CodeCitation Text
3105171Amended CodeCitation Text
310563Amended CodeCitation Text
310565Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback