OH HB229 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on October 17 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-10-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 121.04, 121.09, 307.204, 505.266, 901.08, 901.43, 903.02, 907.11, 923.41, 923.52, 924.52, 941.02, 941.041, 941.14, 942.02, 943.03, 943.031, 943.04, 943.05, 943.16, 953.23, 955.35, 959.14, 1711.50, 1711.51, 1711.57, 3717.22, and 4707.11 and to enact sections 923.411 and 3769.0811 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the laws governing agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-28 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-17 Effective Date
2011-07-15 Governor' Action
2011-07-18 End of 10-day period
2011-07-06 Sent to Governor
2011-06-28 Concurrence
2011-06-28 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-06-24 Committee Report
2011-06-16 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2011-06-16 Introduced to Senate
2011-06-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-06-09 Committee Report - S
2011-05-17 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2011-05-17 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12104Amended CodeCitation Text
12109Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1711Amended CodeCitation Text
171150Amended CodeCitation Text
171151Amended CodeCitation Text
171155Amended CodeCitation Text
171157Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
307204Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3717Amended CodeCitation Text
371722Amended CodeCitation Text
3769New CodeSee Bill Text
37690811New CodeSee Bill Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4707Amended CodeCitation Text
470711Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
505266Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
901Amended CodeCitation Text
90108Amended CodeCitation Text
90143Amended CodeCitation Text
903Amended CodeCitation Text
90302Amended CodeCitation Text
907Amended CodeCitation Text
90711Amended CodeCitation Text
923Amended CodeCitation Text
92341Amended CodeCitation Text
923411New CodeSee Bill Text
92352Amended CodeCitation Text
924Amended CodeCitation Text
92452Amended CodeCitation Text
941Amended CodeCitation Text
94102Amended CodeCitation Text
941041Amended CodeCitation Text
94114Amended CodeCitation Text
942Amended CodeCitation Text
94202Amended CodeCitation Text
943Amended CodeCitation Text
94303Amended CodeCitation Text
943031Amended CodeCitation Text
94304Amended CodeCitation Text
94305Amended CodeCitation Text
94316Amended CodeCitation Text
953Amended CodeCitation Text
95323Amended CodeCitation Text
955Amended CodeCitation Text
95535Amended CodeCitation Text
959Amended CodeCitation Text
95914Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback