OH HB228 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-25 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-25 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0710 and 3301.0715 and to enact sections 3301.132 and 3313.903 of the Revised Code, and to amend Section 10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 130th General Assembly with regard to the administration of state primary and secondary education assessments and to reform the system of funding elementary and secondary education.
Title
, and to amend Section 10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 130th General Assembly with regard to the administration of state primary and secondary education assessments and to reform the system of funding elementary and secondary education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-25 | To Education | |
2014-11-25 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-18 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-07-02 | To Education | |
2013-07-02 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 0715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 13 | 903 | New Code | See Bill Text |