OH HB225 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 9.37, 9.482, 135.01, 135.143, 135.35, 167.03, 305.171, 305.23, 307.862, 307.88, 329.01, 330.04, 349.01, 349.03, 349.04, 349.06, 349.14, 505.603, 3917.04, 4931.41, 4931.43, 4931.44, 4931.45, 4931.49, 4931.50, 4931.64, 4931.65, 4931.66, 5101.01, 5705.13, 5705.392, 5713.07, 5713.08, 5713.081, 5713.082, 5715.13, 5715.27, and 5717.02 and to enact sections 113.43, 148.061, 329.40, 329.41, 329.42, 329.43, 329.44, 329.45, and 329.46 of the Revised Code to vest in county auditors responsibility for reviewing and approving property tax exemption applications for some publicly owned property, to authorize legislative authorities of municipal corporations, county auditors, and boards of township trustees to adopt a direct deposit payroll policy, to clarify that a board of township trustees may offer deferred compensation plans or programs to the township's officers and employees, to authorize regional councils of government to operate a 9-1-1 public safety answering point, to authorize counties and townships to increase the amount credited to "rainy day" reserve balance accounts to one-sixth of the expenditures made in the preceding fiscal year from the fund in which the reserve balance account is established, to authorize the Hocking, Ross, and Vinton Counties' boards of county commissioners to form a pilot joint county department of job and family services, to modify state and county investment authority law, to prohibit centralized-services purchases using moneys from the Real Estate Assessment Fund, to exempt funds subject to the Tax Commissioner's rules governing expenditures from the Real Estate Assessment Fund from county quarterly spending plans, to limit the involvement of county officers and their responsibilities in intergovernmental shared services agreements, to authorize county contracting authorities to give notice of requests for proposals and receive proposals through a secure electronic system, to permit tax complaints to be filed electronically, to authorize a county or township to offer any qualified benefit available under a cafeteria plan, and to offer a health and wellness benefit program, to its officers and employees, and to make changes to the New Community Authority Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To vest in county auditors responsibility for reviewing and approving property tax exemption applications for some publicly owned property, to authorize legislative authorities of municipal corporations, county auditors, and boards of township trustees to adopt a direct deposit payroll policy, to clarify that a board of township trustees may offer deferred compensation plans or programs to the township's officers and employees, to authorize regional councils of government to operate a 9-1-1 public safety answering point, to authorize counties and townships to increase the amount credited to "rainy day" reserve balance accounts to one-sixth of the expenditures made in the preceding fiscal year from the fund in which the reserve balance account is established, to authorize the Hocking, Ross, and Vinton Counties' boards of county commissioners to form a pilot joint county department of job and family services, to modify state and county investment authority law, to prohibit centralized-services purchases using moneys from the Real Estate Assessment Fund, to exempt funds subject to the Tax Commissioner's rules governing expenditures from the Real Estate Assessment Fund from county quarterly spending plans, to limit the involvement of county officers and their responsibilities in intergovernmental shared services agreements, to authorize county contracting authorities to give notice of requests for proposals and receive proposals through a secure electronic system, to permit tax complaints to be filed electronically, to authorize a county or township to offer any qualified benefit available under a cafeteria plan, and to offer a health and wellness benefit program, to its officers and employees, and to make changes to the New Community Authority Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-12-14 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-22 Effective Date
2011-12-21 Governor' Action
2011-12-28 End of 10-day period
2011-12-16 Sent to Governor
2011-12-14 Concurrence
2011-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-12-08 Committee Report - S
2011-06-24 To Finance
2011-06-24 Introduced to Senate
2011-06-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-06-22 Committee Report - S
2011-05-11 To Local Government
2011-05-11 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
113New CodeSee Bill Text
11343New CodeSee Bill Text
135Amended CodeCitation Text
13501Amended CodeCitation Text
135143Amended CodeCitation Text
13535Amended CodeCitation Text
148New CodeSee Bill Text
148061New CodeSee Bill Text
167Amended CodeCitation Text
16703Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
305Amended CodeCitation Text
305171Amended CodeCitation Text
30523Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
307862Amended CodeCitation Text
30788Amended CodeCitation Text
329Amended CodeCitation Text
32901Amended CodeCitation Text
32940New CodeSee Bill Text
32941New CodeSee Bill Text
32942New CodeSee Bill Text
32943New CodeSee Bill Text
32944New CodeSee Bill Text
32945New CodeSee Bill Text
32946New CodeSee Bill Text
330Amended CodeCitation Text
33004Amended CodeCitation Text
349Amended CodeCitation Text
34901Amended CodeCitation Text
34903Amended CodeCitation Text
34904Amended CodeCitation Text
34906Amended CodeCitation Text
34914Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3917Amended CodeCitation Text
391704Amended CodeCitation Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4931Amended CodeCitation Text
493141Amended CodeCitation Text
493143Amended CodeCitation Text
493144Amended CodeCitation Text
493145Amended CodeCitation Text
493149Amended CodeCitation Text
493150Amended CodeCitation Text
493164Amended CodeCitation Text
493165Amended CodeCitation Text
493166Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
505603Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510101Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
570357Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
570513Amended CodeCitation Text
5705392Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
571307Amended CodeCitation Text
571308Amended CodeCitation Text
5713081Amended CodeCitation Text
5713082Amended CodeCitation Text
5715Amended CodeCitation Text
571513Amended CodeCitation Text
571527Amended CodeCitation Text
5717Amended CodeCitation Text
571702Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback