OH HB218 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-17)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-17)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 102.02 and to enact section 125.65 of the Revised Code to require the LeanOhio Office in the Department of Administrative Services to establish an entrepreneur in residence pilot program.
Title
To require the LeanOhio Office in the Department of Administrative Services to establish an entrepreneur in residence pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-19 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Effective Date | |
2014-12-02 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-06 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-11-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-11-19 | Concurrence | |
2014-11-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-11-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-16 | To Workforce & Economic Development | |
2014-01-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-01-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-19 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-19 | To Economic Development and Regulatory Reform | |
2013-06-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 02 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 07 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 631 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 25 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |