OH HB21 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 29 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3319.22 and 3319.223 and to enact section 3319.227 of the Revised Code to qualify Teach for America participants for a resident educator license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To qualify Teach for America participants for a resident educator license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - Amendment (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-29 Effective Date
2011-04-27 Governor' Action
2011-04-13 Concurrence
2011-04-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-04-12 Committee Report - S
2011-03-23 To Education
2011-03-23 Introduced to Senate
2011-03-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-01 Committee Report - S
2011-01-13 To Education
2011-01-13 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
3314013Amended CodeCitation Text
3314014Amended CodeCitation Text
3314016Amended CodeCitation Text
331402Amended CodeCitation Text
3314021Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
331405Amended CodeCitation Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
331922Amended CodeCitation Text
3319223Amended CodeCitation Text
3319227New CodeSee Bill Text
331961Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback