OH HB197 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1901.261, 1901.31, 1907.20, 1907.26, 1907.261, 2303.201, 2929.12, 2929.22, and 4503.39 and to enact sections 1901.44, 1905.202, 1907.25, and 2947.09 of the Revised Code to require that all moneys collected by the clerk of a municipal or county court be paid to the appropriate person, fund, or entity on or before the twentieth day of the month following the month in which they are collected; to authorize a municipal, mayor's, or county court to require community service in lieu of costs if at the time of sentencing or any time after sentencing the court finds that the offender cannot pay costs; to authorize a municipal, mayor's, or county court to allow payment of costs in installments if at the time of sentencing or at any time after sentencing the court finds that the offender will not be able to pay costs in full when due; to raise the ceilings on the optional additional fees that a court of common pleas may charge to fund court computerization or computerization of the court clerk's office; to authorize use of the additional clerk's fees to fund technological advances in the clerk's office; to authorize new fees to fund computerization of or technological advances in the clerk's office; to ensure that after notice to the debtor and an opportunity to enter into an installment payment or community service agreement with the court neither the Registrar of Motor Vehicles nor any deputy registrar accepts any application for the registration or transfer of registration of a motor vehicle of a person who fails to pay any fine or costs imposed for offenses by a common pleas, municipal, mayor's, or county court; and to require a court in determining the sentence for a criminal offense to consider emotional, mental, or physical conditions traceable to an offender's military service that contributed to the offender's commission of the offense and to consider the offender's military service record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require that all moneys collected by the clerk of a municipal or county court be paid to the appropriate person, fund, or entity on or before the twentieth day of the month following the month in which they are collected; to authorize a municipal, mayor's, or county court to require community service in lieu of costs if at the time of sentencing or any time after sentencing the court finds that the offender cannot pay costs; to authorize a municipal, mayor's, or county court to allow payment of costs in installments if at the time of sentencing or at any time after sentencing the court finds that the offender will not be able to pay costs in full when due; to raise the ceilings on the optional additional fees that a court of common pleas may charge to fund court computerization or computerization of the court clerk's office; to authorize use of the additional clerk's fees to fund technological advances in the clerk's office; to authorize new fees to fund computerization of or technological advances in the clerk's office; to ensure that after notice to the debtor and an opportunity to enter into an installment payment or community service agreement with the court neither the Registrar of Motor Vehicles nor any deputy registrar accepts any application for the registration or transfer of registration of a motor vehicle of a person who fails to pay any fine or costs imposed for offenses by a common pleas, municipal, mayor's, or county court; and to require a court in determining the sentence for a criminal offense to consider emotional, mental, or physical conditions traceable to an offender's military service that contributed to the offender's commission of the offense and to consider the offender's military service record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-12 Committee Report - S
2012-11-28 To Judiciary
2012-11-28 Introduced to Senate
2012-11-27 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-02-02 Committee Report - S
2011-04-12 To Judiciary & Ethics
2011-04-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
117New CodeSee Bill Text
117102New CodeSee Bill Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
1901261Amended CodeCitation Text
1901263New CodeSee Bill Text
190131Amended CodeCitation Text
190144New CodeSee Bill Text
1905New CodeSee Bill Text
1905202New CodeSee Bill Text
190533New CodeSee Bill Text
1907Amended CodeCitation Text
190720Amended CodeCitation Text
190725New CodeSee Bill Text
190726Amended CodeCitation Text
1907261Amended CodeCitation Text
1907263New CodeSee Bill Text
23New CodeSee Bill Text
2303New CodeSee Bill Text
2303201Amended CodeCitation Text
2303203New CodeSee Bill Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292912Amended CodeCitation Text
292922Amended CodeCitation Text
2947New CodeSee Bill Text
294709New CodeSee Bill Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
450339Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5503Amended CodeCitation Text
550302Amended CodeCitation Text
57New CodeSee Bill Text
5747New CodeSee Bill Text
5747124New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback